EP2742959 - Device for the storage of fluid, especially medicament [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.10.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2021 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.01.2019 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.11.2021 [2021/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Schott AG Hattenbergstrasse 10 55122 Mainz / DE | [2014/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Langsdorf, Andreas Grundstrasse 53 55218 Ingelheim / DE | 02 /
Henze, Inka Königsberger Strasse 40 55268 Nieder-Olm / DE | 03 /
Beier, Wolfram Windhäuser Weg 4a 55270 Essenheim / DE | 04 /
Ohlinger, Axel Mergenthaler Weg 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/25] | 01 /
Langsdorf, Andreas Grundstrasse 53 55218 Ingelheim / DE | ||
02 /
Henze, Inka Köningberger Strasse 40 55268 Nieder-Olm / DE | |||
03 /
Beier, Wolfram Windhäuser Weg 4a 55270 Essenheim / DE | |||
04 /
Ohlinger, Axel Mergenthaler Weg 2 65205 Wiesbaden / DE | Representative(s) | Sawodny, Michael-Wolfgang, et al Dreiköniggasse 10 89073 Ulm / DE | [2014/25] | Application number, filing date | 13005587.4 | 02.12.2013 | [2014/25] | Priority number, date | DE20121024371 | 13.12.2012 Original published format: DE102012024371 | [2014/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2742959 | Date: | 18.06.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2742959 | Date: | 27.12.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/00, A61M5/24, A61M5/32 | [2014/25] | CPC: |
A61M5/001 (EP,US);
A61M5/3278 (US);
A61M5/2429 (EP,US);
A61M5/3232 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/15] |
Former [2014/25] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Aufbewahrung Lagerung von flüssigen Medien, insbesondere Arzneimitteln | [2014/25] | English: | Device for the storage of fluid, especially medicament | [2014/25] | French: | Dispositif pour stocker le fluide, en particulier pour des médicaments | [2014/25] | Examination procedure | 02.03.2018 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.03.2018 | Examination requested [2018/15] | 30.01.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.03.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.08.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.08.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.11.2019 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.05.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/44] | 17.06.2021 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2021/44] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 30.01.2019 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.12.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.12.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.12.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.12.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]DE4120267 (BADER & PARTNER MEDIZINTECHNIK [DE]) [X] 1-6,9,10 * column 2, line 51 - column 8, line 17; figures 1-9 *; | [X]US6123688 (BOTICH MICHAEL J [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * column 4, line 46 - line 50; figures 13-18 * * column 8, line 42 - line 50 * * column 10, line 23 - column 11, line 33 *; | [X]WO03099358 (SEEDLINGS LIFE SCIENCE VENTURE [US]) [X] 1,2,4,8 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0067]; figures 1-31 *; | [X]WO2004043514 (MDC INVEST HOLDINGS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * page 5, line 10 - page 18, line 8; figures 1-8 *; | [A]GB2471304 (OVAL MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES LTD [GB]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, line 16 - line 32; figures 1-14,20-23 * * page 8, line 30 - page 12, line 21 ** page 14, line 20 - page 15, line 26 * | by applicant | US2549417 | US6015438 | US6190364 | DE69728062T | EP1600190 | US2009259195 | WO2010100244 | WO2011106870 | WO2012000838 | WO2012000832 |