EP2881186 - Method and apparatus to isolate the cold in cryogenic equipment [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.05.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.06.2016 [2016/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Linde Aktiengesellschaft Klosterhofstrasse 1 80331 München / DE | For all designated states Siemens VAI Metals Technologies GmbH Turmstrasse 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2015/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malas, Akin Fohrenweg 5 85757 Karlsfeld / DE | 02 /
Christoforou, Peter 32 Ingram Road Sheffield / GB | [2015/24] | Representative(s) | Gellner, Bernd Linde GmbH Intellectual Property EMEA Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Straße 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2015/24] | Gellner, Bernd Linde AG Patente und Marken Dr.-Carl-von-Linde-Strasse 6-14 82049 Pullach / DE | Application number, filing date | 13005710.2 | 09.12.2013 | [2015/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2881186 | Date: | 10.06.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B21B27/10 | [2015/24] | CPC: |
B21B27/10 (EP,KR,US);
B21B2003/001 (EP,KR,US);
B21B2027/103 (EP,KR,US);
B21B2045/0212 (EP,US);
B21B2203/12 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/24] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Isolieren der Kälte in einer Kryoausrüstung | [2015/24] | English: | Method and apparatus to isolate the cold in cryogenic equipment | [2015/24] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour isoler le froid dans un équipement cryogénique | [2015/24] | Examination procedure | 09.12.2013 | Examination requested [2015/24] | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/24] | 22.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]WO02087803 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,13 * figures 1-6; claims 1-+51 * [A] 2-5,9-12; | [XA]WO2009032688 (AIR PROD & CHEM [US], et al) [X] 1,6-8,13 * paragraph [0028]; figures 1-5; examples 1-2,13-21,23-25,27-28-32,36-37 * * paragraph [0041] * [A] 2-5,9-12; | [A]GB2466458 (SIEMENS VAI METALS TECH LTD [GB]) [A] 1,8* figures 1,3; claims 1,16 *; | [XDA]WO2012110241 (LINDE AG [DE], et al) [XD] 1,6-8,13 * figures 3-5 * [A] 2-5,9-12 | by applicant | WO2012110241 |