EP2747358 - OFDM or OFDMA signaling for ranging and data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.12.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Avago Technologies International Sales Pte. Limited 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | [2018/52] |
Former [2017/38] | For all designated states Avago Technologies General IP (Singapore) Pte. Ltd. 1 Yishun Avenue 7 Singapore 768923 / SG | ||
Former [2014/26] | For all designated states Broadcom Corporation 5300 California Avenue Irvine, CA 92617 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Liu, Hong 23 Hollinwood Irvine, CA 92618 / US | 02 /
Kliger, Avi 16 Alexandrony Street 52225 Ramat Gan / IL | 03 /
Montreuil, Leo 3773 Mill Creek Ct. Atlanta, CA 30341 / US | 04 /
Min, Jonathan 5 Camden Ct Newport Coast, CA 92657 / US | 05 /
Putnam, Jeffrey 67 Grandview Irvine, CA 92603 / US | 06 /
Rajagopal, Ravi 1589 Minorca Dr Costa Mesa, CA 92626 / US | [2014/26] | Representative(s) | Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstraße 13 80639 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/26] | Jehle, Volker Armin Bosch Jehle Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Flüggenstrasse 13 80639 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13005875.3 | 17.12.2013 | [2014/26] | Priority number, date | US201261740051P | 20.12.2012 Original published format: US 201261740051 P | US201361889086P | 10.10.2013 Original published format: US 201361889086 P | US201361911878P | 04.12.2013 Original published format: US 201361911878 P | US201314104044 | 12.12.2013 Original published format: US201314104044 | [2014/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2747358 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2747358 | Date: | 17.01.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.2017 | Classification | IPC: | H04L27/26 | [2014/26] | CPC: |
H04L27/2602 (EP,US);
H04L27/2607 (US);
H04L27/2613 (EP,US);
H04L27/2627 (US);
H04L27/2684 (EP,US);
H04L27/2697 (US);
H04L69/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | OFDM- oder OFDM-Signalisierung für Ortung und Daten | [2014/26] | English: | OFDM or OFDMA signaling for ranging and data | [2014/26] | French: | Signalisation OFDM ou OFDMA pour télémétrie et données | [2014/26] | Examination procedure | 17.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/26] | 04.01.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.04.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2020 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/16] | 15.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/16] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.01.2018 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.01.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 02.01.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 11.01.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2009316804 (CHEN YUANJIE [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0031] * * figure 1 * * figure 4 ** figure 5 * |