EP2712700 - Laser drills without burr formation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 07.02.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.03.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.02.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Werner-von-Siemens-Straße 1 80333 München / DE | [2017/35] |
Former [2014/21] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/14] | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Massa, Andrea Lothar-Bucher-Str. 18 12157 Berlin / DE | 02 /
Oppert, Andreas Wiesenweg 4c 14612 Falkensee / DE | [2014/14] | Application number, filing date | 13006050.2 | 04.05.2010 | [2014/14] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2712700 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/38 | [2014/14] | CPC: |
B23K26/389 (EP,CN,US);
B23K26/386 (US);
B23K26/388 (US);
B23K2101/001 (EP,CN,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/16] | Title | German: | Laserbohren ohne Gratbildung | [2014/14] | English: | Laser drills without burr formation | [2014/14] | French: | Perçage au laser sans formation de bavure | [2014/14] | Examination procedure | 05.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 14.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2018 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.03.2018 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.2019 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2019 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2020/11] | 31.10.2019 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2020/11] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10004709.1 / EP2384845 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100004709) is 03.05.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.05.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.05.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.05.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.05.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 18.05.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 17.05.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0826457 (ROLLS ROYCE PLC [GB]); | [Y]US2002104831 (CHANG JIM J [US], et al); | [A]EP1806203 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) | by applicant | EP0486489 | EP0412397 | EP0892090 | EP0786017 | WO9967435 | US6024792 | WO0044949 | EP1306454 | EP1319729 | EP1204776 |