Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.04.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] |
03.11.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
20.05.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |
18.04.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.05.2014 [2014/21] |