EP2612792 - Child car seat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.10.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 11.11.2016 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 31.10.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Combi Corporation 6-7, Moto-Asakusa 2-chome, Taito-ku Tokyo-To / JP | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fujita, Morihiko c/o Combi Corporation 36-18, Minami-urawa 3-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | 02 /
Osaka, Noriyuki c/o Combi Corporation 36-18, Minami-urawa 3-chome Minami-ku Saitama-shi, Saitama-ken / JP | [2016/50] |
Former [2013/28] | 01 /
Fujita, Morihiko c/o Combi Corporation 36-18, Minami-urawa 3-chome Minami-ku, Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | ||
02 /
Osaka, Noriyuki c/o Combi Corporation 36-18, Minami-urawa 3-chome Minami-ku, Saitama-shi Saitama-ken / JP | Representative(s) | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/50] | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/28] | Liesegang, Eva Boehmert & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13150122.3 | 03.01.2013 | [2013/28] | Priority number, date | JP20120001461 | 06.01.2012 Original published format: JP 2012001461 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2612792 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2612792 | Date: | 14.12.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/28 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
B60N2/2812 (EP,KR,US);
B60N2/265 (US);
B60N2/2851 (EP,US);
B60N2/60 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/50] |
Former [2013/28] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kindersitz | [2013/28] | English: | Child car seat | [2013/28] | French: | Siège auto pour enfant | [2013/28] | Examination procedure | 20.12.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.12.2013 | Examination requested [2014/13] | 12.07.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 27.10.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 27.10.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.10.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.07.2016 | Opposition(s) | 15.09.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 03.01.2013 | AL | 14.12.2016 | AT | 14.12.2016 | BE | 14.12.2016 | CY | 14.12.2016 | CZ | 14.12.2016 | DK | 14.12.2016 | EE | 14.12.2016 | ES | 14.12.2016 | FI | 14.12.2016 | HR | 14.12.2016 | IT | 14.12.2016 | LT | 14.12.2016 | LV | 14.12.2016 | MC | 14.12.2016 | MK | 14.12.2016 | NL | 14.12.2016 | PL | 14.12.2016 | RO | 14.12.2016 | RS | 14.12.2016 | SE | 14.12.2016 | SI | 14.12.2016 | SK | 14.12.2016 | SM | 14.12.2016 | TR | 14.12.2016 | IE | 03.01.2017 | LU | 03.01.2017 | MT | 03.01.2017 | CH | 31.01.2017 | LI | 31.01.2017 | FR | 14.02.2017 | BG | 14.03.2017 | GB | 14.03.2017 | NO | 14.03.2017 | GR | 15.03.2017 | IS | 14.04.2017 | PT | 14.04.2017 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/15] | HU | 03.01.2013 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
TR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 14.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/51] | HU | 03.01.2013 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
MK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 14.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/46] | HU | 03.01.2013 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CY | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 14.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2019/31] | HU | 03.01.2013 | |
AT | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 14.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
MT | 03.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 14.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SI | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
IE | 03.01.2017 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 14.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
GB | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
LU | 03.01.2017 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 14.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/50] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
DK | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2017 | ||
LI | 31.01.2017 | ||
FR | 14.02.2017 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/42] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
MC | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 14.12.2016 | |
BE | 14.12.2016 | ||
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
IT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
SM | 14.12.2016 | ||
BG | 14.03.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
PT | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/36] | BE | 14.12.2016 | |
CZ | 14.12.2016 | ||
EE | 14.12.2016 | ||
ES | 14.12.2016 | ||
FI | 14.12.2016 | ||
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
PL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RO | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
SK | 14.12.2016 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
IS | 14.04.2017 | ||
Former [2017/31] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
NL | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/28] | FI | 14.12.2016 | |
HR | 14.12.2016 | ||
LT | 14.12.2016 | ||
LV | 14.12.2016 | ||
RS | 14.12.2016 | ||
SE | 14.12.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2017 | ||
NO | 14.03.2017 | ||
GR | 15.03.2017 | ||
Former [2017/12] | LV | 14.12.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2002145318 (ASBACH RONALD M [US], et al); | [XI]US6491348 (KAIN JAMES M [US]); | [XI]DE102007043020 (TAKATA PETRI AG [DE]) | by applicant | JP2002062201 | JP2002362201 | JP2007143835 |