EP2615005 - Brake assembly including independently activatable brake actuators [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 30.11.2018 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.08.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.2019 [2019/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 115 Tabor Road Morris Plains, NJ 07950 / US | [2015/51] |
Former [2013/29] | For all designated states Honeywell International Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Spray, Matthew HONEYWELL INTERNATIONAL INC. Patent Services M/S AB/2B 101 Columbia Road P. O. Box 2245 Morristown, NJ New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | Houghton, Mark Phillip Patent Outsourcing Limited 1 King Street Bakewell, Derbyshire DE45 1DZ / GB | [2013/29] | Application number, filing date | 13150425.0 | 07.01.2013 | [2013/29] | Priority number, date | US201213347282 | 10.01.2012 Original published format: US201213347282 | [2013/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2615005 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B60T8/17, B60T8/171 | [2013/29] | CPC: |
B60T8/1703 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bremsenanordnung mit unabhängig voneinander aktivierbaren Bremsaktuatoren | [2013/29] | English: | Brake assembly including independently activatable brake actuators | [2013/29] | French: | Ensemble de freinage comprenant des actionneurs de freinage indépendamment activables | [2013/29] | Examination procedure | 07.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/29] | 22.05.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.08.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2019/01] | 28.08.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2019/01] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.05.2013 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2018 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2011226569 (DEVLIEG GARRETT H [US]) [X] 1-5,7-10 * paragraphs [0001] , [0002] , [0004] , [0006] - [0009] - [0026] - [0028] - [0031] , [0032]; figures 3-6 * [I] 6; | [X]US2003010583 (ARNOLD JEFFREY K [US], et al) [X] 1,2,7-10 * paragraph [0006]; figures 1-3 *; | [X]US2010222942 (DEVLIEG GARRETT H [US], et al) [X] 1-5,9,10 * paragraphs [0017] , [0042] - [0075]; figures 1-19 * |