Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.07.2015 [2015/29] |
07.03.2015 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit | |
20.02.2015 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
09.07.2014 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |
06.06.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 09.07.2014 [2014/28] |