EP2755259 - Self-assembled composite of graphene oxide and H4V3O8 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Belenos Clean Power Holding AG Seevorstadt 6 2502 Bienne / CH | [2014/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mettan, Yoann Chemin de Lédarray 1 1902 Evionnaz / CH | [2014/29] | Representative(s) | Supper, Marc, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets SA Faubourg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/29] | Supper, Marc, et al ICB Ingénieurs Conseils en Brevets Fbg de l'Hôpital 3 2001 Neuchâtel / CH | Application number, filing date | 13150846.7 | 10.01.2013 | [2014/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2755259 | Date: | 16.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/04, H01M4/1391, H01M4/36, H01M4/485, H01M4/583, H01M4/62 | [2014/29] | CPC: |
H01M4/0471 (EP);
H01M4/1391 (EP);
H01M4/364 (EP);
H01M4/485 (EP);
H01M4/583 (EP);
H01M4/625 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Selbst zusammengestellter Verbundstoff aus Grafenoxid und H4V3O8 | [2014/29] | English: | Self-assembled composite of graphene oxide and H4V3O8 | [2014/29] | French: | Composites auto-assemblés d'oxyde de graphène et de H4V3O8 | [2014/29] | Examination procedure | 10.01.2013 | Examination requested [2014/29] | 17.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 09.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012171574 (ZHAMU ARUNA [US], et al) [X] 1,6,12-15 * paragraph [0112] * [Y] 2-5; | [XDYI]EP2445049 (BELENOS CLEAN POWER HOLDING AG [CH]) [XD] 7,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] * * paragraph [0036] * [Y] 2-5 [I] 8-10; | [A]US2012321953 (CHEN GUORONG [US], et al) [A] 1-15; | [A] - VANESSA LEGAGNEUR ET AL, "New layered vanadium oxides MyH1-yV3O8*nH2O (M=Li, Na, K) obtained by oxidation of the precursor H2V3O8", JOURNAL OF MATERIALS CHEMISTRY, THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, vol. 10, no. 12, doi:10.1039/B005559J, ISSN 0959-9428, (20001106), pages 2805 - 2810, (20001106), XP002636962 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b005559j | by applicant | EP2445049 | US2010081057 | US2010143798 | US2011045347 | WO2006030361 | US2012088156 | EP1119537 | - DANIEL R. DREYER ET AL., CHEM. SOC. REV., (2010), vol. 39, pages 228 - 240 | - K. S. NOVOSELOV ET AL., SCIENCE, (2004), vol. 306, pages 666 - 669 | - YANWU ZHU ET AL., ADV. METR., (2010), vol. 22, pages 3906 - 3924 | - SASHA STANKOVICH ET AL., CARBON, (2007), vol. 45, pages 1558 - 1565 | - TOMMY KASPAR, ETH THESIS, (2010), page 18931 | - ZHONG-SHUAI WU ET AL., ACS NANO, (20100501), vol. 87, page 3194 |