EP2620885 - Medical image processing apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.12.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.08.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.12.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 03.01.2018 [2018/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385, Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi-ken 324-8550 / JP | [2017/07] |
Former [2016/51] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP | |||
Former [2013/31] | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | ||
For all designated states Toshiba Medical Systems Corporation 1385 Shimoishigami Otawara-shi, Tochigi 324-8550 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bird, Ian Douglas c/o Toshiba Medical Visualization Systems Europe Limited Bonnington Bond 2 Anderson Place Edinburgh, EH6 5NP / GB | 02 /
Roberts, Colin John c/o Toshiba Medical Visualization Systems Europe Limited Bonnington Bond 2 Anderson Place Edinburgh, EH6 5NP / GB | [2013/31] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Lewis, Darren John D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13151430.9 | 16.01.2013 | [2013/31] | Priority number, date | US201213361003 | 30.01.2012 Original published format: US201213361003 | JP20120224021 | 09.10.2012 Original published format: JP 2012224021 | [2013/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2620885 | Date: | 31.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/31] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2620885 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.05.2016 | Classification | IPC: | G06F19/00 | [2013/31] | CPC: |
G16H30/20 (EP,US);
F04C2270/041 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2017/02] |
Former [2013/31] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Medizinische Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung | [2013/31] | English: | Medical image processing apparatus | [2013/31] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'images médicales | [2013/31] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/31] | 06.12.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.08.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/01] | 29.08.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]WO03045222 (VIATRONIX INC [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * page 2, line 6 - line 27 * * page 7, line 15 - page 8, line 25 * * page 14, line 17 - page 16, line 4 * * page 18, line 3 - line 12 *; | [I]US6658080 (POOLE IAN [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * column 4, line 1 - line 40 ** page 14, line 1 - page 15, line 3 *; | [XI]US7324673 (YAMANAKA TAKATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1-5 * column 8, line 29 - column 11, line 14 * * column 22, line 49 - column 23, line 22 * * column 23, line 33 - column 25, line 22 * * figures 19, 22-24, 26 * [I] 6-15; | [I]US2011188720 (NARAYANAN AJAY [IN], et al) [I] 1-15 * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0031] * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0049] * |