EP2757593 - Plated electrical contacts for solar modules [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.08.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.09.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 30.05.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.07.2022 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MKS IP Association Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2018/42] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | ||
Former [2014/30] | For all designated states Atotech Deutschland GmbH Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Voss, Torsten Märkische Allee 48 16548 Glienicke / DE | 02 /
Lamprecht, Sven Fraunhoferstrasse 20 10587 Berlin / DE | [2018/42] |
Former [2014/30] | 01 /
Voss, Torsten Märkische Allee 48 16548 Glienicke / DE | ||
02 /
Lamprecht, Sven Kaiserin-Augusta-Allee 86c 10589 Berlin / DE | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2018/42] |
Former [2014/30] | Wonnemann, Jörg Atotech Deutschland GmbH Patent Management Erasmusstraße 20 10553 Berlin / DE | Application number, filing date | 13151680.9 | 17.01.2013 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2757593 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2757593 | Date: | 17.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L31/05, H01L23/538 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H01L31/0508 (EP,CN,US);
H01L31/0516 (US);
H01L31/0512 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/18 (EP,CN,US);
H01L2224/24137 (EP,US);
H01L2224/32225 (EP,US);
H01L2224/73267 (EP,US);
H01L2224/92244 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3512 (EP,US);
Y02E10/50 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2018/42] |
Former [2014/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Überzogene elektrische Kontakte für Solarmodule | [2014/30] | English: | Plated electrical contacts for solar modules | [2014/30] | French: | Contacts électriques plaqués pour modules solaires | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 14.01.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.01.2015 | Examination requested [2015/09] | 12.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.05.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.09.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 12.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 18.07.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/39] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.01.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.01.2013 | AL | 17.10.2018 | AT | 17.10.2018 | CY | 17.10.2018 | CZ | 17.10.2018 | DK | 17.10.2018 | EE | 17.10.2018 | FI | 17.10.2018 | HR | 17.10.2018 | LT | 17.10.2018 | LV | 17.10.2018 | MC | 17.10.2018 | MK | 17.10.2018 | NL | 17.10.2018 | PL | 17.10.2018 | RO | 17.10.2018 | RS | 17.10.2018 | SE | 17.10.2018 | SI | 17.10.2018 | SK | 17.10.2018 | SM | 17.10.2018 | TR | 17.10.2018 | BG | 17.01.2019 | GB | 17.01.2019 | IE | 17.01.2019 | LU | 17.01.2019 | MT | 17.01.2019 | NO | 17.01.2019 | GR | 18.01.2019 | BE | 31.01.2019 | CH | 31.01.2019 | LI | 31.01.2019 | IS | 17.02.2019 | PT | 17.02.2019 | [2022/31] |
Former [2021/33] | HU | 17.01.2013 | |
AL | 17.10.2018 | ||
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
MT | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2021/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CY | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
MT | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/29] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
MT | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/17] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
TR | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/09] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.01.2019 | ||
IE | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/04] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
CH | 31.01.2019 | ||
LI | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2020/03] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
GB | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/50] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SI | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
BE | 31.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/44] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
LU | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/40] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
MC | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SK | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
EE | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RO | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
SM | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/35] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
CZ | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/34] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
DK | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AL | 17.10.2018 | |
AT | 17.10.2018 | ||
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
PT | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/25] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
RS | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
SE | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
GR | 18.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/23] | AT | 17.10.2018 | |
FI | 17.10.2018 | ||
HR | 17.10.2018 | ||
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
LV | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/22] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
PL | 17.10.2018 | ||
BG | 17.01.2019 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/21] | FI | 17.10.2018 | |
LT | 17.10.2018 | ||
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
IS | 17.02.2019 | ||
Former [2019/20] | LT | 17.10.2018 | |
NL | 17.10.2018 | ||
NO | 17.01.2019 | ||
Former [2019/17] | NL | 17.10.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1553025 (MASSACHUSETTS INST TECHNOLOGY) [Y] 1,2,4 * page 3, line 65 - page 4, line 38 *; | [Y]EP0710991 (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 4 * page 6, line 34 - page 7, line 49 *; | [Y]WO2006093023 (SHARP KK [JP], et al) [Y] 1,2,4 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0023] - paragraph [0029] *; | [Y]WO2009097588 (XUNLIGHT CORP [US], et al) [Y] 4 * paragraph [0152] - paragraph [0157] *; | [A]GB2467361 (RENEWABLE ENERGY CORP ASA [NO]) [A] 1,2 * page 2, line 21 - page 4, line 42 ** page 8, line 31 - page 10, line 40 * |