EP2725576 - Image processing apparatus and control method thereof and image processing system. [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Joo-yeong SK Apt. No. 102-1405, Seocheon-dong, Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Ban, Seok-ho Twin Park Officetel No. B-1209, Ingye-dong Paldal-gu, Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | 03 /
Park, Sang-shin Woosung Apt. No. 21-107, Seocho 2-dong, Seocho-gu Seoul / KR | [2014/18] | Representative(s) | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/18] | Brandon, Paul Laurence Appleyard Lees 15 Clare Road Halifax, HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13151818.5 | 18.01.2013 | [2014/18] | Priority number, date | KR20120119634 | 26.10.2012 Original published format: KR 20120119634 | [2014/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2725576 | Date: | 30.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G10L15/22 | [2014/18] | CPC: |
G10L15/00 (EP,US);
H04N21/4227 (KR);
G10L15/22 (US);
G06F3/16 (KR);
G10L15/26 (KR);
G10L25/48 (US);
H04N21/42203 (EP,US);
H04N21/4394 (EP,US);
H04N21/47 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/18] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bildverarbeitungsvorrichtung und Steuerverfahren dafür, und Bildverarbeitungssystem | [2014/18] | English: | Image processing apparatus and control method thereof and image processing system. | [2014/18] | French: | Appareil de traitement d'image et son procédé de commande et système de traitement d'image | [2014/18] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2014/18] | 25.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.06.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/20] | 12.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2008059178 (YAMAMOTO DAISUKE [JP], et al) [X] 1,8,11,12 * abstract * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0073] * [Y] 9,10 [I] 2-7,13,14; | [IY]US6327566 (VANBUSKIRK RONALD E [US], et al) [I] 1-7,11-14 * abstract * * column 6, line 15 - column 7, line 46 * [Y] 8-10; | [IY]US7835913 (AUBAUER ROLAND [DE]) [I] 1-9,11-14 * abstract * * claims 1,3-6 * [Y] 8-10; | [IY]US2008126091 (CLARK JASON W [US], et al) [I] 1-7,11-14 * the whole document * [Y] 8-10; | [IY]US5852804 (SAKO KAZUYA [JP]) [I] 1-9,11-14 * abstract * * claims 1,3 * [Y] 8-10; | [A]US2006075429 (ISTVAN ANTHONY F [US], et al) [A] 1-14 * the whole document *; | [Y]US2006009980 (BURKE PAUL M [US], et al) [Y] 8-10 * claims 1-3 *; | [Y]US2003046074 (RUBACK HARVEY M [US], et al) [Y] 8,10 * claims 1,5 *; | [Y]US2012215539 (JUNEJA AJAY [US]) [Y] 8,9 * the whole document * |