Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.01.2019 | Withdrawal of application | published on 27.02.2019 [2019/09] |
05.01.2018 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
03.01.2017 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
23.12.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
08.01.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
19.12.2014 | Request for examination filed | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
19.12.2014 | Change - designated states | published on 21.01.2015 [2015/04] |
13.12.2014 | Amendment by applicant | |
09.05.2014 | Publication of search report | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
09.05.2014 | Change - classification | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
09.05.2014 | Change - classification | published on 11.06.2014 [2014/24] |
23.07.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 24.07.2013 [2013/30] |