Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2013191769 | Global Dossier | 25.07.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20120006337 | 19.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101869522B | Global Dossier | 22.06.2018 | B1 | KR20130085285 | 29.07.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20120006337 | 19.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6181372B | Global Dossier | 16.08.2017 | B2 | JP2013149255 | 01.08.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20120006337 | 19.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103279381 | Global Dossier | 04.09.2013 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20120006337 | 19.01.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2618250 | Global Dossier | 11.06.2014 | A3 | EP2618250 | 24.07.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20120006337 | 19.01.2012 |