EP2757764 - Responding to incoming calls [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 06.03.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.03.2015 | Withdrawal of application | published on 08.04.2015 [2015/15] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BlackBerry Limited 2200 University Avenue East Waterloo, ON N2K 0A7 / CA | [2014/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kumar, Surender 2550 W. Golf Road, Ext. 65750 Rolling Meadows, IL 60006 / US | 02 /
Lukasik, Susan L. 2550 W. Golf Road, Ext. 65754 Rolling Meadows, IL 60008 / US | [2014/30] | Representative(s) | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2014/30] | Noble, Nicholas, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13151915.9 | 18.01.2013 | [2014/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2757764 | Date: | 23.07.2014 | Language: | EN | [2015/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2757764 | Date: | 28.01.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/05] |
Former [2015/04] | Type: | A3 Search report | |
No.: | EP2757764 | ||
Date: | |||
Status: | (deleted) | ||
[2015/04] | |||
[2015/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04M3/42, H04M7/00, // H04M3/428, H04M3/46 | [2014/30] | CPC: |
H04M3/42042 (EP);
H04M7/0033 (EP);
H04M2203/1016 (EP);
H04M2203/2011 (EP);
H04M3/42263 (EP);
H04M3/4285 (EP);
H04M3/46 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Antwort auf eingehende Anrufe | [2014/30] | English: | Responding to incoming calls | [2014/30] | French: | Répondre à des appels entrants | [2014/30] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2013 | Examination requested [2014/30] | 26.02.2015 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2015/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US7313228 (SORICE STEPHEN [US], et al) [X] 1,3,4,6-9,14 * abstract * * figures 1,2 * * column 1, line 11 - column 2, line 9 * * column 2, line 60 - column 3, line 37 * * column 4, line 46 - column 4, line 64 * [I] 2,5,10-13,15 |