EP2617333 - CAPSULE FEEDING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/30] | Capsule feeding apparatus | ||
[2014/27] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.09.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N&W Global Vending S.p.A. Via Roma 24 Valbrembo / IT | [2013/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Magno, Alessandro Via San Luca, 63 24030 Brembate Sopra / IT | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Boggio, Luigi, et al Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2013/30] | Application number, filing date | 13151977.9 | 18.01.2013 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | IT2012TO00035 | 19.01.2012 Original published format: IT TO20120035 | [2013/30] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617333 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2617333 | Date: | 19.11.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47J31/36 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
A47J31/3642 (EP,US);
A47J31/36 (RU);
A47J31/3633 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/30] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUM ZUFÜHREN VON KARTUSCHEN | [2014/10] | English: | CAPSULE FEEDING APPARATUS | [2014/27] | French: | APPAREIL DISTRIBUTEUR DE CAPSULE | [2014/10] |
Former [2013/30] | Vorrichtung zum Zuführen von Kartuschen | ||
Former [2013/30] | Capsule feeding apparatus | ||
Former [2013/30] | Appareil distributeur de capsule | Examination procedure | 09.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/09] | 06.06.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.10.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2014 | Opposition(s) | 20.08.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/44] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.01.2013 | AL | 19.11.2014 | AT | 19.11.2014 | BG | 19.11.2014 | CY | 19.11.2014 | CZ | 19.11.2014 | DK | 19.11.2014 | EE | 19.11.2014 | FI | 19.11.2014 | HR | 19.11.2014 | LT | 19.11.2014 | LV | 19.11.2014 | MC | 19.11.2014 | MK | 19.11.2014 | MT | 19.11.2014 | PL | 19.11.2014 | RO | 19.11.2014 | RS | 19.11.2014 | SI | 19.11.2014 | SK | 19.11.2014 | SM | 19.11.2014 | TR | 19.11.2014 | IE | 18.01.2015 | LU | 18.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | NO | 19.02.2015 | GR | 20.02.2015 | IS | 19.03.2015 | PT | 19.03.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MK | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
SM | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/39] | HU | 18.01.2013 | |
AT | 19.11.2014 | ||
BG | 19.11.2014 | ||
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
TR | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
MT | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SI | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
IE | 18.01.2015 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
MC | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
LU | 18.01.2015 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
SK | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
CZ | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RO | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
DK | 19.11.2014 | ||
EE | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/26] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
CY | 19.11.2014 | ||
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 19.11.2014 | |
FI | 19.11.2014 | ||
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
HR | 19.11.2014 | ||
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
LV | 19.11.2014 | ||
PL | 19.11.2014 | ||
RS | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
GR | 20.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | FI | 19.11.2014 | |
LT | 19.11.2014 | ||
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
IS | 19.03.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
PT | 19.03.2015 | ||
Former [2015/21] | LT | 19.11.2014 | |
NO | 19.02.2015 | ||
Former [2015/20] | LT | 19.11.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2009133570 (TATA TEA LTD [IN], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 25, line 9 - page 37, line 1; figure - *; | [A]FR2907766 (SEB SA [FR]) [A] 1-12 * page 8, line 10 - page 17, line 12; figure - *; | [A]WO2005104911 (NESTEC SA [CH], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 8, line 35 - page 16, line 29; figure - *; | [A]EP2306417 (FAS INTERNATIONAL SPA [IT]) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0010] - [0046]; figure - *; | [AD]WO2004045350 (NECTA VENDING SOLUTIONS SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 5, line 5 - page 14, line 2; figure - *; | [AD]WO2006097399 (N&W GLOBAL VENDING SPA [IT], et al) [AD] 1-12 * page 3, paragraph 7 - page 5, paragraph 2; figure - * | by applicant | EP1571951 | EP1859418 |