EP2617911 - Method and system for construction of a building [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2017 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MC | published on 22.11.2017 [2017/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vastint Hospitality B.V. Hettenheuvelweg 51 1101 BM Amsterdam / NL | [2015/08] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Inter Hospitality Holding B.V. Hettenheuvelweg 51 1101 BM Amsterdam Zuidoost / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Malakauskas, Giedrius Koninginneweg 150-2 1075 ED Amsterdam / NL | 02 /
Baltramiejunas, Marius Prinses Margrietlaan 16 1182BG Amstelveen / NL | 03 /
Müller, Harald Dieter Ul. Wilenska 42 80-215 Gdansk / PL | 04 /
Andersson, Erik Roger Bielawa ul. Czeslawa Niemena 26 05-520 Konstancin Jeziorna / PL | 05 /
Hattig, Thomas Drève d'Argenteuil 52 1410 Waterloo / BE | 06 /
Sodemann, Steen Torben Sijsjeslaan 13 3080 Tervuren / BE | 07 /
Müller, Philip Ul. Wilenska 42 80-215 Gdansk / PL | [2016/16] |
Former [2014/49] | 01 /
Malakauskas, Giedrius Koninglaan 68 1075AG Amsterdam / NL | ||
02 /
Baltramiejunas, Marius Prinses Margrietlaan 16 1182BG Amstelveen / NL | |||
03 /
Müller, Harald Dieter Avenue Champ de Mai 16 Boite 7 1410 Waterloo / BE | |||
04 /
Andersson, Erik Roger Bielawa ul. Czeslawa Niemena 26 05-520 Konstancin Jeziorna / PL | |||
05 /
Hattig, Thomas Drève d'Argenteuil 52 1410 Waterloo / BE | |||
06 /
Sodemann, Steen Torben Sijsjeslaan 13 3080 Tervuren / BE | |||
07 /
Müller, Philip Ul. Wilenska 42 80-215 Gdansk / PL | |||
Former [2013/30] | 01 /
Malakauskas, Giedrius Koninglaan 68 1075AG Amsterdam / NL | ||
02 /
Baltramiejunas, Marius Prinses Margrietlaan 16 1182BG Amstelveen / NL | |||
03 /
Müller, Harald Dieter Avenue Champ de Mai 16 Boite 7 1410 Waterloo / BE | |||
04 /
Andersson, Erik Roger Bielawa ul. Czeslawa Niemena 26 05-520 Konstancin Jeziorna / PL | |||
05 /
Hattig, Thomas Traunsteiner Str. 7 10781 Berlin / DE | |||
06 /
Sodemann, Steen Torben Rue Saint Saens 4 1420 Braine L'Alleud / BE | |||
07 /
Müller, Philip Ul. Wilenska 42 80-215 Gdansk / PL | Representative(s) | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/16] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | ||
Former [2013/30] | Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188 203 13 Malmö / SE | Application number, filing date | 13152277.3 | 22.01.2013 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | SE20120050043 | 23.01.2012 Original published format: SE 1250043 | SE20120050044 | 23.01.2012 Original published format: SE 1250044 | US201261589626P | 23.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261589626 P | US201261589635P | 23.01.2012 Original published format: US 201261589635 P | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2617911 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2617911 | Date: | 20.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/348, E04B1/35, E04H1/00 | [2015/41] | CPC: |
E04H1/005 (EP,US);
E04B1/348 (RU,US);
E04B1/34838 (EP,RU,US);
E04B1/34869 (EP,RU,US);
E04B1/66 (US);
E04B1/74 (US);
E04B1/35 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2013/30] | E04B1/348 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/16] |
Former [2013/30] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zum Bauen eines Gebäudes | [2013/30] | English: | Method and system for construction of a building | [2013/30] | French: | Procédé et système de construction d'un bâtiment | [2013/30] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/01] | 07.05.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.09.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.06.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.09.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 18.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP16165859.6 / EP3093406 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.05.2014 | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | MC | 20.04.2016 | SM | 20.04.2016 | [2017/47] |
Former [2017/13] | SM | 20.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]NL6903809 (WRW-PRODUKTER AB) [A] 1 * page 2, line 15 - page 4, line 13; figure . *; | [A]US4788802 (WOKAS ALBERT L [US]) [A] 3-5 * column 1, line 61 - column 5, line 56; figure - *; | [A]DE9313274U (HUFER HANS PETER DIPL ING FH [DE]) [A] 4,5 * figures 2-5; claims 1-2 *; | [AD]US2005108957 (QUESADA JORGE D [US]) [AD] 2,6,7,9,10 * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0070]; figure - *; | [XI]WO2005088021 (OLESCH GRZEGORZ [PL]) [X] 13,16,19 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0055]; figure - * [I] 1-12,14,15,17,18,20; | [A]WO2006119517 (DOLINSEK RENE [AT]) [A] 3 * page 5, line 20 - page 8, line 32; figures 1-10 *; | [A]WO2008143496 (OSIB IP HOLDINGS LTD [CY], et al) [A] 12,18* page 2, line 6 - page 10, line 11; figure - * | by applicant | GB1213009 | EP0462790 | CA2046217 | EP0565842 | WO0034593 | US2005108957 | WO2006013653 | WO2008102152 |