EP2642773 - Method and apparatus to manage wireless direct access communication group [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.05.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pantech Co., Ltd. Pantech Bldg. I-2, DMC Sangam-dong Mapo-gu Seoul 121-792 / KR | [2013/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Jeong-Hwan PANTECH Bldg., I-2, DMC Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu Seoul 121-792 / KR | 02 /
Seo, Hyun-Seok PANTECH Bldg., I-2, DMC Sangam-dong, Mapo-gu Seoul 121-792 / KR | [2013/39] | Representative(s) | Weickmann & Weickmann PartmbB Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/39] | Jordan, Volker Otto Wilhelm, et al Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 860 820 81635 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13152625.3 | 25.01.2013 | [2013/39] | Priority number, date | KR20120029536 | 22.03.2012 Original published format: KR 20120029536 | [2013/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2642773 | Date: | 25.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/39] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2642773 | Date: | 21.05.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/21] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.04.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/08, // H04W76/02 | [2013/39] | CPC: |
H04W4/08 (EP,US);
H04W76/00 (KR);
H04W48/16 (KR);
H04W76/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/39] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Verwaltung einer Kommunikationsgruppe mit drahtlosem direktem Zugriff | [2013/39] | English: | Method and apparatus to manage wireless direct access communication group | [2013/39] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour gérer un groupe de communication à accès direct sans fil | [2013/39] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 14.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/24] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]KR20100132426 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [I] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [P]US2012100837 (HAN KUK-HYUN [KR], et al) [P] * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0044] * * paragraph [0055] - paragraph [0074] * * paragraph [0089] - paragraph [0096] * | [XI] - "Wi-Fi Peer-to-Peer (P2P) Specification v1.2", vol. V1.2, (20111214), pages 1 - 159, WI-FI PEER-TO-PEER (P2P) SPECIFICATION V1.2, WI-FI ALLIANCE, US, URL: https://www.wi-fi.org/knowledge-center/published-specifications, (20111214), XP008165048 [X] 1-3,6,7 * section 3.1.2 * * section 3.2.4 - 3.2.5 * * page 116 - page 119 * [I] 4,5,8-15 |