EP2705849 - A preparation for use of aspartate for regulating glucose levels in blood [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent revoked Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.03.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.11.2017 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.12.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.06.2023 | Revocation of patent | published on 02.08.2023 [2023/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/11] | For all designated states N.V. Nutricia Eerste Stationsstraat 186 2712 HM Zoetermeer / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hageman, Robert Johan Joseph Hamsterlaan 12 6705 CT Wageningen / NL | [2014/11] | Representative(s) | Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720 2502 LS The Hague / NL | [2014/11] | Application number, filing date | 13152810.1 | 18.07.2005 | [2014/11] | Priority number, date | US20040588793P | 19.07.2004 Original published format: US 588793 P | EP20040077100 | 19.07.2004 Original published format: EP 04077100 | EP20040077359 | 20.08.2004 Original published format: EP 04077359 | [2014/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2705849 | Date: | 12.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2705849 | Date: | 15.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2705849 | Date: | 04.04.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.09.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/02, A61K31/4188, A61K31/714, A61K36/81, A61K36/889, A61K36/48, A23L33/17, A23L33/18, A23L33/19 | [2017/48] | CPC: |
A61K31/714 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/198 (RU,US);
A23L33/18 (EP,CN,US);
A23L13/424 (EP,CN,US);
A23L13/65 (EP,CN,US);
A23L23/10 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/17 (EP,US);
A23L33/175 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/185 (EP,CN,US);
A23L33/19 (EP,US);
A23L33/40 (EP,CN,US);
A61K31/4188 (EP,CN,US);
A61K36/48 (EP,CN,US);
A61K36/81 (EP,CN,US);
A61K36/899 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/01 (EP,CN,US);
A61K38/02 (EP,CN,US);
A61P1/16 (EP);
A61P11/00 (EP);
A61P13/12 (EP);
A61P15/08 (EP);
A61P19/06 (EP);
A61P27/10 (EP);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/00 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P31/00 (EP);
A61P37/04 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
A61P7/00 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
A61P9/12 (EP);
A23V2002/00 (EP,CN,US);
| C-Set: |
A61K36/48, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K36/81, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A61K36/899, A61K2300/00 (US,CN,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/328, A23V2250/0636, A23V2250/061, A23V2250/0628, A23V2250/062, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/608, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/5106, A23V2250/156, A23V2250/15 (US,CN,EP);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/5488, A23V2250/15, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/612, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/1614, A23V2250/1618, A23V2250/1582, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/1588, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/0644 (CN);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/5488, A23V2250/15, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/612, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/1882, A23V2250/1614, A23V2250/1618, A23V2250/1582, A23V2250/1592, A23V2250/1588, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/0644 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/332, A23V2250/61, A23V2250/0618, A23V2250/54252, A23V2250/5488, A23V2250/612, A23V2250/5114, A23V2250/1842, A23V2250/156, A23V2250/702, A23V2250/712, A23V2250/7042, A23V2250/7052, A23V2250/72, A23V2250/7046, A23V2250/0644 (CN,EP,US)
(-) |
Former IPC [2014/42] | A61K38/02, A61K38/16, A61K31/4188, A61K31/714, A61P3/00, A61K38/01, A61K36/48, A61K36/81 | ||
Former IPC [2014/11] | A61K38/02, A61K38/16, A61K31/4188, A61K31/714, A61P3/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2014/11] | Title | German: | Präparat zur Verwendung als Aspartat zur Regulierung des Glucosespiegels im Blut | [2014/11] | English: | A preparation for use of aspartate for regulating glucose levels in blood | [2014/11] | French: | Préparation pour utiliser de l'aspartate afin de réguler des taux de glucose dans le sang | [2014/11] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2013 | Examination requested [2014/11] | 15.04.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.10.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 14.12.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.10.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 17.11.2017 | 17.11.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 27.11.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.02.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 26.02.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.02.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05762926.3 / EP1771192 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050762926) is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
19.12.2018
ADMISSIBLE Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Else-Krömer-Strasse 1 61352 Bad Homburg / DE Opponent's representative Fresenius Kabi Deutschland GmbH Patent Department Pharmaceuticals Division Borkenberg 14 61440 Oberursel / DE | [2019/04] | 18.01.2019 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 28.05.2019 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 12.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 09.03.2020 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 29.09.2022 | Legal effect of revocation of patent [2023/31] | Appeal following opposition | 07.05.2020 | Appeal received No. T1150/20 | 17.07.2020 | Statement of grounds filed | 29.09.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected | 26.06.2023 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 29.09.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 14.12.2016 | Request for further processing filed | 14.12.2016 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 02.01.2017 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 30.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 30.06.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 29.06.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 18.07.2005 | AT | 04.04.2018 | CY | 04.04.2018 | CZ | 04.04.2018 | EE | 04.04.2018 | FI | 04.04.2018 | LT | 04.04.2018 | LV | 04.04.2018 | MC | 04.04.2018 | RO | 04.04.2018 | SI | 04.04.2018 | SK | 04.04.2018 | BG | 04.07.2018 | GR | 05.07.2018 | LU | 18.07.2018 | BE | 31.07.2018 | IS | 04.08.2018 | PT | 06.08.2018 | [2020/33] |
Former [2020/31] | HU | 18.07.2005 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CY | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
LU | 18.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2020/28] | HU | 18.07.2005 | |
AT | 04.04.2018 | ||
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
LU | 18.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SI | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
LU | 18.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
LU | 18.07.2018 | ||
BE | 31.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/17] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
LU | 18.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/15] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
MC | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 04.04.2018 | |
CZ | 04.04.2018 | ||
EE | 04.04.2018 | ||
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
RO | 04.04.2018 | ||
SK | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | EE | 04.04.2018 | |
FI | 04.04.2018 | ||
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2019/03] | FI | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
PT | 06.08.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | FI | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
GR | 05.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/51] | FI | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
LV | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/50] | FI | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | ||
BG | 04.07.2018 | ||
Former [2018/47] | FI | 04.04.2018 | |
LT | 04.04.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0629350 (SANDOZ NUTRITION LTD [CH]) [X] 1,3,8 * page 9, lines 14-30; claim 15 * [Y] 1-18; | [Y]US6042834 (BARAKA MOHAMED WASIF [KW]) [Y] 1-18 * claim 1 *; | [Y]WO0137850 (NESTLE SA [CH], et al) [Y] 1-18 * page 9, lines 29-30; claims 1, 5, 6; page 10, lines 4-12 *; | [XY]US2003118663 (CHANG CHING-MING [TW]) [X] 1,3 * claims 1-3 * [Y] 1-18; | [XDY]WO03105882 (NOVARTIS NUTRITION AG [CH], et al) [XD] 1,3,4,7 * claims 1-3 * [Y] 1-18; | [XDY]US6706697 (MACDONALD BRADLEY T [US]) [XD] 5,7 * abstract; claim 1 * [Y] 1-18; | [Y]WO2004056207 (UNILEVER NV [NL], et al) [Y] 1-18 * abstract, page 25, lines 15-22, claims *; | [Y] - LAVIGNE C ET AL, "COD AND SOY PROTEINS COMPARED WITH CASEIN IMPROVE GLUCOSE TOLERANCEAND INSULIN SENSITIVITY IN RATS", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHYSIOLOGY: ENDOCRINOLOGY AND METABOLISM, AMERICAN PHYSIOLOGICAL SOCIETY, BETHESDA, MD, US, (20000101), vol. 278, no. 3 part 1, ISSN 0193-1849, pages E491 - E500, XP000978740 [Y] 1-18 * title and abstract * | by applicant | US1560000 | US5430064 | EP0758852 | EP0957692 | WO03105882 | WO03105605 | US2004043013 | US6706697 | WO2004023891 | US6720312 | - ADV. EXP. MED. BIOL., (1990), vol. 270, pages 205 - 225 | Opposition | WO9110441 | US6743770 | WO2004056207 | - BRAND-MILLER, J. et al., "Glycemic index and obesity", The American Journal of Clinical Nutrition, (20020000), vol. 76, no. 1, pages 281S - 285S, XP055545837 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/ajcn/76.1.281S | - DEL CARMEN CRESPILLO et al., "Metabolic effects of an enteral nutrition formula for diabetes: Comparison with standard formulas in patients with type 1 diabetes", Clinical Nutrition, (20031000), vol. 22, no. 5, pages 483 - 487, XP055545839 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0261-5614(03)00047-5 | - Anonymous, "Enterale Ernährung Trink- aund Sondennahrrungen Produktkatalog", Fresenius Kabi, (20000000), pages 3 - 63, XP055545842 |