EP2609832 - Powered toothbrush with rotating sections [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.08.2018 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 01.09.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.06.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York, NY 10022 / US | [2016/25] |
Former [2013/27] | For all designated states Colgate-Palmolive Company 300 Park Avenue New York NY 10022-7499 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gatzemeyer, John, J. 85 Rohill Road Hillsborough, NJ New Jersey 08844 / US | 02 /
Mintel, Thomas 439 Central Avenue Rahway, NJ New Jersey 07065 / US | [2013/27] | Representative(s) | Thum, Bernhard, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/40] | Thum, Bernhard, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/27] | Jenkins, Peter David Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13152884.6 | 25.03.2003 | [2013/27] | Priority number, date | US20020107092 | 26.03.2002 Original published format: US 107092 | [2013/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2609832 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2609832 | Date: | 02.04.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2609832 | Date: | 04.10.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A46B13/02, A61C17/26, // A61C17/34 | [2017/17] | CPC: |
A61C17/222 (EP,US);
A61C17/26 (EP,KR,US);
A46B13/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61C17/349 (EP,US);
A46B2200/1066 (EP,US);
A61C17/3436 (EP,US);
A61C17/3454 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2014/14] | A46B13/02, A61C17/26, // A61C17/34 | ||
Former IPC [2013/27] | A46B13/02, A61C17/34, A61C17/26, A61C17/22 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/27] | Title | German: | Motorisch betriebene Zahnbürste mit rotierenden Abschnitten | [2013/27] | English: | Powered toothbrush with rotating sections | [2013/27] | French: | Brosse à dents électrique à sections rotatives | [2013/27] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2013 | Examination requested [2013/27] | 02.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP03711675.3 / EP1489941 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20030711675) is 27.01.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.07.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 10.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | 31.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 14 | 27.03.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 15 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 25.03.2003 | AT | 04.10.2017 | CY | 04.10.2017 | CZ | 04.10.2017 | DK | 04.10.2017 | EE | 04.10.2017 | ES | 04.10.2017 | FI | 04.10.2017 | IT | 04.10.2017 | MC | 04.10.2017 | NL | 04.10.2017 | PT | 04.10.2017 | RO | 04.10.2017 | SE | 04.10.2017 | SI | 04.10.2017 | SK | 04.10.2017 | TR | 04.10.2017 | BG | 04.01.2018 | GR | 05.01.2018 | IE | 25.03.2018 | LU | 25.03.2018 | BE | 31.03.2018 | [2020/31] |
Former [2020/27] | HU | 25.03.2003 | |
AT | 04.10.2017 | ||
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
PT | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.03.2018 | ||
LU | 25.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
TR | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.03.2018 | ||
LU | 25.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/12] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.03.2018 | ||
LU | 25.03.2018 | ||
BE | 31.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
IE | 25.03.2018 | ||
LU | 25.03.2018 | ||
Former [2019/04] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
LU | 25.03.2018 | ||
Former [2018/52] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
MC | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SI | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/41] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
IT | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
RO | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/35] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
CZ | 04.10.2017 | ||
DK | 04.10.2017 | ||
EE | 04.10.2017 | ||
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
SK | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/24] | AT | 04.10.2017 | |
ES | 04.10.2017 | ||
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
SE | 04.10.2017 | ||
BG | 04.01.2018 | ||
GR | 05.01.2018 | ||
Former [2018/22] | ES | 04.10.2017 | |
FI | 04.10.2017 | ||
NL | 04.10.2017 | ||
Former [2018/17] | NL | 04.10.2017 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US5416942 (BALDACCI LAPO [IT], et al) [AD] 1,3,4,6,7 * column 3, line 16 - column 5, line 10 * * figures 1, 3, 6 *; | [A]US5467495 (BOLAND BERNHARD [DE], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * column 3, lines 35-41 * * figure 2b *; | [A]US5524312 (TAN KUO-CHING [TW], et al) [A] 1,2,9 * column 1, line 61 - column 2, line 36 * * figure 2 *; | [A]US5577285 (DROESSLER MICHAEL [DE]) [A] 1,3,4,6,7 * column 8, lines 4-42 * * figure 6 *; | [A]EP0765642 (BRAUN AG [DE]) [A] 1,6,8 * column 4, lines 13-22 ** figures 2, 3 *; | [A]US5732433 (GOECKING WOLFGANG [DE], et al) [A] 1,2,5-7 * column 4, lines 56-60 * * figures 1a, 2 *; | [A]WO0160281 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM GMBH & CO [DE], et al) [A] 1,5-7 * figures 3A, 5A * | by applicant | US1796641 | US5070567 | US5146942 | US5416942 | US5625916 | USRE35941E | US6032313 | US20020066459 |