EP2630905 - Water softening device and dishwasher having the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.04.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.04.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 18.05.2016 [2016/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si Gyeonggi-do 443-742 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lee, Sang Hoon No. 102-301, Samsung-Myoungga town Apt., Gyo-ri Yeoju-eup, Yeoju-gun Gyeonggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Jeong Myeong No. 202, Sung-a village Dogok-dong Gangnam-gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Son, Young Myung No. 576, Samnang-ri, Samnangjin-eup Miryang-si Gyeongsangnam-do / KR | 04 /
Cho, Han Wook No. 2302-2003, Backgyeon Maeul Halla Vivaldi Apt. Dongbaek-dong Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do / KR | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13152961.2 | 29.01.2013 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | KR20120009077 | 30.01.2012 Original published format: KR 20120009077 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2630905 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, D06F39/00 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
A47L15/4229 (EP,US);
C02F1/42 (KR);
A47L15/42 (KR);
C02F5/00 (KR);
D06F39/007 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Wasserenthärtungsvorrichtung und Geschirrspüler damit | [2013/35] | English: | Water softening device and dishwasher having the same | [2013/35] | French: | Dispositif d'adoucissement de l'eau et lave-vaisselle l'utilisant | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 31.07.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.12.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2016/20] | 13.01.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2016/20] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 31.07.2015 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1844693 (BITRON SPA [IT]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * paragraphs [0001] , [0022] - [0027]; figures 3-5 * [Y] 3,4,6,15; | [Y]EP0591678 (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [Y] 3,4 * column 5, line 7 - column 6, line 2; figures 1-3b *; | [Y]EP1023868 (PREMARK FEG LLC [US]) [Y] 6 * paragraph [0049]; figures 2,3 *; | [Y]WO2011154426 (ARCELIK AS [TR], et al) [Y] 15 * paragraph [0004]; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3015728 (LICENTIA GMBH [DE]) [X] 1,2,11,12 * page 11, paragraph 2; figures 1,3 *; | [X]EP0461722 (BAUKNECHT HAUSGERAETE [DE], et al) [X] 1,11 * column 4, line 35 - column 5, line 20; figure 1 *; | [X]DE3535364 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [X] 1,2,10 * column 3, line 23 - column 4, line 66; figure 1 *; | [A]DE3028743 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [A] 1,6,11 * figure 1 *; | [A]CH417877 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1,11 * figure 1 * |