Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2589563 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2589563



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 279
03.08.2018 Closing of application Search / examination 1
03.07.2018 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.05.2018 Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) Search / examination 2
25.01.2018 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
22.01.2018 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
22.01.2018 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.09.2017 Annex to the communication Search / examination 4
22.09.2017 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
08.01.2016 Examination started Search / examination 1
15.11.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
08.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
08.11.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
08.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
08.11.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
08.11.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
08.11.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 4
08.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
06.11.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
14.05.2013 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
10.04.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
03.04.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
26.03.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
22.03.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.03.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 6
22.03.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
31.01.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
31.01.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
31.01.2013 Description Search / examination 16
31.01.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Drawings Search / examination 8
31.01.2013 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
31.01.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
29.01.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 153
17.12.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35