EP2762847 - Fiber optic sensor system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.07.2015 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.08.2015 [2015/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor toegepast- natuurwetenschappelijk onderzoek TNO Anna van Buerenplein 1 2595 DA 's-Gravenhage / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2014/32] | For all designated states Nederlandse Organisatie voor Toegepast -Natuurwetenschappelijk Onderzoek TNO Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagen, Ronald Antonius Jan c/o TNO-PLT Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | 02 /
Nieuwland, Remco Alexander c/o TNO-PLT Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | 03 /
Toet, Peter Martijn c/o TNO-PLT Schoemakerstraat 97 2628 VK Delft / NL | [2014/32] | Representative(s) | Jansen, Cornelis Marinus, et al V.O. Johan de Wittlaan 7 2517 JR Den Haag / NL | [2014/32] | Application number, filing date | 13153537.9 | 31.01.2013 | [2014/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2762847 | Date: | 06.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01L1/24, G01B11/16 | [2014/32] | CPC: |
G01L1/246 (EP,US);
G01B11/161 (US);
G01B11/18 (EP,US);
G01B9/02002 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Glasfaser-Sensorsystem und -verfahren | [2014/32] | English: | Fiber optic sensor system and method | [2014/32] | French: | Système de capteur à fibres optiques et procédé | [2014/32] | Examination procedure | 31.01.2013 | Examination requested [2014/32] | 07.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/33] | 23.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/33] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US6278810 (SIRKIS JAMES S [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * column 1, line 23 - line 60 * * column 10, line 19 - line 53 * * figures 2,8 *; | [A]US2005094151 (PANG GI S [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0050] - paragraph [0063] ** figures 4,5 *; | [YD]WO2012087136 (TNO [NL], et al) [YD] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [YD] - XU M G ET AL, "Discrimination between strain and temperature effects using dual-wavelength fibre grating sensors", ELECTRONICS LETTERS, IEE STEVENAGE, GB, (19940623), vol. 30, no. 13, doi:10.1049/EL:19940746, ISSN 0013-5194, pages 1085 - 1087, XP006000740 [YD] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19940746 | by applicant | WO2012087136 | - XU ET AL., "Discrimination between strain and temperature effects using dual-wavelength fiber grating sensors", ELECTRONIC LETTERS, (1994), vol. 30, doi:doi:10.1049/el:19940746, pages 1085 - 1087, XP006000740 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1049/el:19940746 |