08.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.08.2022 [2022/32] |
01.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.08.2022 [2022/31] |
17.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.07.2022 [2022/29] |
10.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.07.2022 [2022/28] |
03.06.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
22.01.2021 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.02.2021 [2021/08] |
30.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.12.2020 [2020/49] |
23.10.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2020 [2020/48] |
22.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.06.2020 [2020/26] |
15.05.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.06.2020 [2020/25] |
27.03.2020 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 29.04.2020 [2020/18] |
20.03.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.04.2020 [2020/17] |
28.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.04.2020 [2020/14] |
14.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2020 [2020/12] |
07.02.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2020 [2020/11] |
31.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2020 [2020/10] |
24.01.2020 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
22.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
15.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] |
08.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.12.2019 [2019/50] |
01.11.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.12.2019 [2019/49] |
25.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.11.2019 [2019/48] |
18.10.2019 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.11.2019 [2019/47] |
19.04.2019 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.05.2019 [2019/21] |
12.04.2019 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
10.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
10.04.2019 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.02.2019 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.01.2019 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
22.06.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
02.03.2018 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.02.2018 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.01.2018 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
06.10.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
24.05.2017 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
27.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2017 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
27.01.2017 |
First examination report |
|
29.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.10.2015 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
23.10.2015 |
Change - designated states |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
19.10.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
17.04.2015 |
Publication of search report |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
17.04.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
17.04.2015 |
Change - classification |
published on 20.05.2015 [2015/21] |
24.01.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.08.2013 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 07.08.2013 [2013/32] |