Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9861368 | Global Dossier | 09.01.2018 | B2 | US2015223818 | 13.08.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213365372 | 03.02.2012 | US201514694234 | 23.04.2015 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017201179 | Global Dossier | 16.03.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213365372 | 03.02.2012 | AU2017201179 | 22.02.2017 | AU2013200231 | 15.01.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9038882 | Global Dossier | 26.05.2015 | B2 | US2013200131 | 08.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213365372 | 03.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2013200231B | Global Dossier | 09.02.2017 | B2 | AU2013200231 | 22.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213365372 | 03.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2623042 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2019 | B1 | EP2623042 | 20.05.2015 | A3 | EP2623042 | 07.08.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US201213365372 | 03.02.2012 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2801502 | 03.08.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201213365372 | 03.02.2012 |