EP2624296 - Protection of an integrated circuit against invasive attacks [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.2014 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 27.08.2014 [2014/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Altis Semiconductor 224 Boulevard John Kennedy 91105 Corbeil Essonnes Cedex / FR | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cioranesco, Jean-Michel 26, rue de La Jonquière 75017 Paris / FR | 02 /
Naccache, David chez Ilanite Naccache Gendreau 6 rue du square du pont Colbert 78000 - Versailles France 75018 PARIS / FR | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Hervouet-Malbec, Sylvie, et al Ipsilon Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Hervouet, Sylvie, et al Feray Lenne Conseil Le Centralis 63, avenue du Général Leclerc 92340 Bourg-la-Reine / FR | Application number, filing date | 13153728.4 | 01.02.2013 | [2013/32] | Priority number, date | FR20120051076 | 06.02.2012 Original published format: FR 1251076 | [2013/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2624296 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.03.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/58, G06F21/75 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
H01L23/576 (EP);
H01L2924/0002 (EP)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Schutz eines integrierten Schaltkreises gegen invasive Angriffe | [2013/32] | English: | Protection of an integrated circuit against invasive attacks | [2013/32] | French: | Protection d'un circuit integre contre des attaques invasives | [2013/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/35] | 02.04.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/35] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE10338435 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraphs [0001] - [0005] - [0037] - [0046]; figure 4 *; | [A]US2010001757 (JANKE MARCUS [DE], et al) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0001] - paragraph [0038]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]WO0067319 (INFINEON TECHNOLOGIES AG [DE], et al) [A] 7 * abstract *; | [A]US2006095975 (YAMADA TAKAYOSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0099] - paragraph [0120]; figures 9-18 *; | [A]FR2824648 (GEMPLUS CARD INT [FR]) [A] 1-9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP1840964 (IRVINE SENSORS CORP [US]) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0021] - [0029]; figures 1,2B,2C * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0044]; figure 5 *; | [A]US2003037212 (CAPPS LOUIS BENNIE [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0035]; figures 1,2 * | by applicant | US6798234 | US7288786 |