EP2623407 - Folding vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.2014 [2014/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DI Blasi Industriale S.r.l. Contrada Risicone 95049 Vizzini / IT | [2013/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Di Blasi, Carmelo Via V. Emanuele 32 96015 Francofonte / IT | 02 /
Di Blasi, Carlo Maria Via Messina 6 96015 Francofonte / IT | [2013/32] | Representative(s) | Pavan, Andrea, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2013/32] | Pavan, Andrea, et al Notarbartolo & Gervasi S.p.A. Corso di Porta Vittoria 9 20122 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 13154026.2 | 05.02.2013 | [2013/32] | Priority number, date | IT2012CT00002 | 06.02.2012 Original published format: IT CT20120002 | [2013/32] | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2623407 | Date: | 07.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B62K5/00, B62K5/02, B62K15/00 | [2013/32] | CPC: |
B62K15/008 (EP);
B62K5/007 (EP);
B62K5/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/32] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Klappbares Fahrzeug | [2013/32] | English: | Folding vehicle | [2013/32] | French: | Véhicule pliable | [2013/32] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/37] | 18.03.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/37] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3580348 (BLASI ROSARIO DI) [A] 1-8 * column 2, line 6 - column 4, line 27; figures 1-9 *; | [A]EP1398258 (DI BLASI CARMELO [IT], et al) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0012] - [0081]; figures 1-12 * |