EP2615794 - Circuit switching user agent system, communication device, and service providing method used therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NEC Corporation 7-1, Shiba 5-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-8001 / JP | [2013/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Takano, Yusuke c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | 02 /
Tamura, Toshiyuki c/o NEC Corporation, 7-1, Shiba 5-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo, 108-8001 / JP | [2013/29] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/29] | Vossius & Partner Siebertstrasse 4 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13154210.2 | 11.12.2007 | [2013/29] | Priority number, date | JP20060346031 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: JP 2006346031 | [2013/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2615794 | Date: | 17.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/29] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2615794 | Date: | 25.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L12/66, H04M3/00 | [2013/52] | CPC: |
H04L65/1073 (EP,US);
H04L65/1036 (EP,US);
H04L65/104 (EP,US);
H04L65/1046 (EP,US);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04L65/1095 (EP);
H04L69/08 (US);
H04L69/085 (EP,KR);
H04M7/1235 (EP,US);
H04W8/02 (KR);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04M3/38 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/29] | H04L29/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/29] | Title | German: | Leitungsvermitteltes Benutzerendsystemteil, Kommunikationsvorrichtung und Dienstbereitstellungsverfahren dafür | [2013/29] | English: | Circuit switching user agent system, communication device, and service providing method used therefor | [2013/29] | French: | Système d'agent utilisateur de commutation de circuit, dispositif de communication et procédé de fourniture de service utilisé à cet effet | [2013/29] | Examination procedure | 26.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 12.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07850676.3 / EP2096810 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 05.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2003027569 (EJZAK RICHARD PAUL [US]) [X] 1-9 * abstract * * page 1, paragraph 7 - paragraph 11 * * page 2, paragraph 30 - page 5, paragraph 69 * * page 8, paragraph 104 - paragraph 112 ** page 7, paragraph 95 - paragraph 100 * |