EP2591915 - A method of operating a printing press [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2014 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.07.2014 [2014/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pressline Services, Inc 9711 Green Park Industrial Drive St. Louis, MO 63123 / US | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Digenova, Phillip 545 Pinellas Bayway S. 303 Tierra Verde FL 33715 / US | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | Casbon, Paul Richard Lucas & Co 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Casbon, Paul Richard Lucas & Co, 135 Westhall Road Warlingham, Surrey CR6 9HJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13154371.2 | 19.03.2009 | [2013/20] | Priority number, date | US20080040037P | 27.03.2008 Original published format: US 40037 P | US20080040034P | 27.03.2008 Original published format: US 40034 P | US20080040031P | 27.03.2008 Original published format: US 40031 P | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2591915 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B41F13/56, B41F33/06, B41F13/02 | [2013/20] | CPC: |
B41F13/02 (EP,US);
B41F19/008 (US);
B41F13/08 (US);
B41F13/10 (EP,US);
B41F13/56 (EP,US);
B41F13/60 (EP,US);
B41F17/00 (US);
B41F27/12 (US);
B41F33/0009 (US);
B65H45/12 (US);
B65H45/162 (EP,US);
B41P2227/11 (EP,US);
B41P2227/12 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | Betriebsverfahren einer Druckerpresse | [2013/20] | English: | A method of operating a printing press | [2013/20] | French: | Procédés de fonctionnement d'une presse d impression | [2013/20] | Examination procedure | 16.11.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/31] | 15.01.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2014/31] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP09724763.9 / EP2259924 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20090724763) is 05.07.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2014 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2004244615 (HERBERT BURKARD OTTO [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * paragraphs [0124] , [0053] , [0054]; figures 3,19 *; | [A]WO2005068336 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-12 * page 12, paragraph 3 - page 13, paragraph 5; figures 2,3 * * page 36, paragraph 3 - page 37, paragraph 1; figure 19 * * page 41, paragraph 3 - page 42, paragraph 4; figures 21-23 * * page 49, paragraph 1 - page 54, paragraph 3 *; | [A]US7121207 (TABOR GREGORY F [US], et al) [A] 1-12 * column 3, line 40 * * column 4, line 9 *; | [A]DE102006057469 (KOENIG & BAUER AG [DE]) [A] 1-12* paragraphs [0003] , [0038] - [0042]; figure 2; claim 1 * |