EP2592881 - Method and apparatus for power scaling for multi-carrier wireless terminals [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.07.2018 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.06.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.07.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.08.2018 [2018/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states InterDigital Patent Holdings, Inc. 200 Bellevue Parkway Suite 300 Wilmington, DE 19809 / US | [2013/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Pelletier, Benoit 11-13th Street Montreal, Québec I18Y 1L3 / CA | 02 /
Pani, Diana 1950 Lincoln Avenue Apt. 1812 Montreal, Québec H3H 2N8 / CA | 03 /
Levy, Joseph S. 26 East Webster Street Merrick, NY 11566 / US | 04 /
Xi, Fengjun 11 Covington Street Huntington Station, NY 11746 / US | 05 /
Cave, Christopher R. 258 Baffin, Dollard-des-Ormeaux Montreal, Québec H9A 3J2 / CA | [2013/20] | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 5117 200 71 Malmö / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/20] | Hjalmarsson, Magnus Axel, et al Awapatent AB P.O. Box 99 351 04 Växjö / SE | Application number, filing date | 13154738.2 | 23.04.2010 | [2013/20] | Priority number, date | US20090172109P | 23.04.2009 Original published format: US 172109 P | US20090218830P | 19.06.2009 Original published format: US 218830 P | US20090235803P | 21.08.2009 Original published format: US 235803 P | [2013/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2592881 | Date: | 15.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/20] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2592881 | Date: | 03.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/27] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W52/14, H04W52/28, H04L5/00, H04W52/16 | [2013/27] | CPC: |
H04L5/0007 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/367 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/325 (KR,US);
H04B7/26 (KR);
H04L5/0021 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/146 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/16 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/28 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H04W52/286 (EP,CN,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2013/20] | H04W52/34, H04W52/36, H04W52/14, H04W52/28, H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/20] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Leistungsskalierung für drahtlose Mehrträger-Endgeräte | [2013/20] | English: | Method and apparatus for power scaling for multi-carrier wireless terminals | [2013/20] | French: | Procédé et appareil de mise à l'échelle de puissance pour terminaux sans fil à porteuses multiples | [2013/20] | Examination procedure | 02.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/08] | 31.05.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.2017 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.03.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/35] | 26.04.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2018/35] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP10715468.4 / EP2422557 | Divisional application(s) | EP18164424.6 / EP3358891 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20100715468) is 17.09.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.03.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.04.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.04.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 25.04.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2018 | 09   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2006103067 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-16 * * figures 1,2a,2b * * page 3, line 6 - line 8 * * page 4, line 31 - page 5, line 27 * * page 6, line 29 - page 7, line 18 * * page 13, line 18 - page 15, line 27 *; | [A]EP1793509 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]) [A] 1-17 * claims 1-7 * * figure 3 *; | [A] - ADHOC CHAIRMAN (JOHAN BERGMAN ET AL, "Minutes from RAN1 adhoc session on DC-HSDPA MIMO, DC-HSUPA and TxAA extension for non-MIMO UEs, Seoul, Korea, March 26, 2009", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-091642 REL-9 HSPA ADHOC, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090328), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090328, XP050339180 [A] 1-17 * page 2 - page 3 * | [A] - HUAWEI, "Considerations on scheduling control for DC-HSUPA", 3GPP DRAFT; R2-092470 CONSIDERATIONS ON SCHEDULING CONTROL FOR DC-HSUPA, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090325), no. Seoul, Korea; 20090325, XP050340168 [A] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] , [ 2.1] , [ 2.2] * | [XP] - INTERDIGITAL COMMUNICATION LLC, "Power scaling for data and control channel DC-HSUPA", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-092599, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090624), no. Los Angeles, USA; 20090624, XP050351093 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * | [XP] - ERICSSON, "DC-HSUPA power scaling", 3GPP DRAFT; R1-091894 DC-HSUPA POWER SCALING, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, (20090428), no. San Francisco, USA; 20090428, XP050339385 [XP] 1-17 * the whole document * |