EP2633856 - ATP citrate lyase inhibitors for treating cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.11.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.11.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.12.2014 [2015/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia, PA 19104-6283 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | For all designated states The Trustees of The University of Pennsylvania 3160 Chestnut Street, Suite 200 Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19104-6283 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thompson, Craig B. 304 Mallwyd Road Merion Station, PA 19066 / US | 02 /
Bauer, Daniel 251 South 22nd Street Philadelphia, PA 19103 / US | 03 /
Hatzivassiliou, Georgia 2425 Lombard Street Philadelphia, PA 19146 / US | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Lau, Sarah Jane Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Lau, Sarah Jane Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 13155657.3 | 07.05.2004 | [2013/36] | Priority number, date | US20030469233P | 09.05.2003 Original published format: US 469233 P | [2013/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2633856 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2633856 | Date: | 01.01.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.12.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/34, A61P35/00, A61K51/04 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
A61K31/34 (EP,US);
A61K51/0491 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2013/36] | Title | German: | ATP-Citrat-Lyasehemmer zur Behandlung von Krebs | [2013/36] | English: | ATP citrate lyase inhibitors for treating cancer | [2013/36] | French: | Inhibiteurs de lyase de citrate d'ATP pour le traitement du cancer | [2013/36] | Examination procedure | 02.07.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/01] | 07.08.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/01] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP04751597.8 / EP1626711 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 14.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.05.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2014 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO02070676 (MERCK PATENT GMBH [DE], et al) [Y] 1-11 * page 10, line 32 - page 11, paragraph 1 *; | [AD]WO9322304 (SMITHKLINE BEECHAM PLC [GB], et al) [AD] 1-11 * claims 1-17 * * page 1, paragraph 3 *; | [AD]US5447954 (GRIBBLE ANDREW D [GB], et al) [AD] 1-11 * column 1 - lines 24-62 * | [Y] - SULLIVAN A C ET AL, "Reactivity and inhibitor potential of hydroxycitrate isomers with citrate synthase, citrate lyase, and ATP citrate lyase", vol. 252, no. 21, ISSN 0021-9258, (19771110), pages 7583 - 7590, JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, US, URL: http://www.jbc.org/content/252/21/7583.abstract, XP008163761 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [Y] - SZUTOWICZ A ET AL, "Effect of (-)hydroxycitrate on the activities of ATP citrate lyase and the enzymes of acetyl CoA metabolism in rat brain", ACTA BIOCHIMICA POLONICA, POLSKIE TOWARZYSTWO BIOCHEMICZNE, PL, (19760101), vol. 23, no. 2-3, ISSN 0001-527X, pages 227 - 234, XP008163764 [Y] 1-11 * abstract * | [A] - KARZEL K ET AL, "[The effect of benzenecarboxylic acids--in particular mellitic acid--in in vitro biological system]", ARZNEIMITTEL-FORSCHUNG JAN 1989 LNKD- PUBMED:2719744, (198901), vol. 39, no. 1, ISSN 0004-4172, pages 6 - 11, XP008125960 [A] 1 * abstract * * page 7; table 1 * | by applicant | US5447954 | US6414002 | US2003087935 | US2003069275 | - CZEMIN, J., ACTA MEDICA AUSTRIACA, (2002), vol. 29, pages 162 - 170 | - VANDER HEIDEN, M. G. ET AL., CELL, (1997), vol. 91, pages 627 - 637 | - ELSHOURBAGY, N. A. ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (1990), vol. 265, pages 1430 - 1435 | - ELSHOURBAGY, N. A. ET AL., BUR J BIOCHEM, (1992), vol. 204, pages 491 - 499 | - FUKUDA, H. ET AL., J BIOCHEM (TOKYO, (1999), vol. 126, pages 437 - 444 | - BARROW ET AL., "Antimycins, Inhibitors of ATP-Citrate Lyase, from a Streptomyces sp.", JOURNAL OF ANTIBIOTICS, (1997), vol. 50, no. 9, page 729 | - HOFFINANN GE ET AL., BIOCHIM BIOPHYS ACTA, (19801006), vol. 620, no. 1, pages 151 - 8 | - SZUTOWICZ A ET AL., ACTA BIOCHIM POL, (1976), vol. 23, no. 2-3, pages 227 - 34 | - SULLIVAN AC ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (19771110), vol. 252, no. 21, pages 7583 - 90 | - KAPLAN ET AL., J BIOL CHEM, (19900805), vol. 265, no. 22, pages 13379 - 85 | - ZARA V ET AL., BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (19960625), vol. 223, no. 3, pages 508 - 13 | - STIPANI, I ET AL., FEBS LETT, (19830919), vol. 161, no. 2, pages 269 - 74 | - LAW D ET AL., AM J PHYSIOL, (199207), vol. 263, no. 1, pages C220 - 5 | - PARADIES G ET AL., ARCH BIOCHEM BIOPHYS, (19900501), vol. 278, no. 2, pages 425 - 30 | - SIMPSON W. J. ET AL., "Influence of location and extent of surgical resection on survival of patients with glioblastoma multiforms: Results of three consecutive Radiation Therapy Oncology Group (RTOG) clinical trials", INT J RADIAT ONCOL BIOL PHYS, (1993), vol. 26, pages 239 - 244, XP026848892 | - BORGELT ET AL., "The palliation of brain metastases: Final results of the first two studies of the Radiation Therapy Oncology Group", INT J RADIAT ONCOL BIOL PHYS, (1980), vol. 6, pages 1 - 9 | - BERKHOUT, T.A. ET AL., BIOCHEM J., (1990), vol. 272, pages 181 - 186 | - BARTH, C.; HACKENSCHMIDT, J.; ULMANN, H.; DECKER, K., "Inhibition of cholesterol synthesis by (-)-hydroxycitrate in perfused rat liver. Evidence for an extramitochondrial mevalonate synthesis from acetyl coenzyme A", FEBS LETT, (1972), vol. 22, doi:doi:10.1016/0014-5793(72)80266-7, pages 343 - 346, XP025600375 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0014-5793(72)80266-7 | - BENJAMIN, W. B.; PENTYALA, S. N.; WOODGETT, J. R.; HOD, Y.; MARSHAK, D., "ATP citrate lyase and glycogen synthase kinase-3 beta in 3T3-Ll cells during differentiation into adipocytes", BIOCHEM J, (1994), vol. 300, pages 477 - 482 | - BERKHOUT, T.A.; HAVEKES, K. M.; PEARCE, N. J.; GROOT, P. H., "The effect of (-)-hydroxycitrate on the activity of the low-density-lipoprotein receptor and 3-hydroxy-3-methylglutaryl-CoA reductase levels in the human hepatoma cell line Hep G2", BIOCHEM J., (1990), vol. 272, pages 181 - 186, XP008125901 | - BERWICK, D. C.; HERS, I.; HEESOM, K. J.; MOULE, S. K.; TAVARE, J. M., "The identification of ATP-citrate lyase as a protein kinase B (Akt) substrate in primary adipocytes", JBIOL CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 33895 - 33900 | - DOLLE, R. E.; MCNAIR, D.; HUGHES, M. J.; KRUSE, L. I.; EGGELSTON, D.; SAXTY, B. A.; WELLS, T. N.; GROOT, P. H., "ATP-citrate lyase as a target for hypolipidemic intervention. Sulfoximine and 3-hydroxy-beta-lactam containing analogues of citric acid as potential tight- binding inhibitors", J MED CHEM, (1992), vol. 35, pages 4875 - 4884 | - DOLLE, R. E.; GRIBBLE, A.; WILKES, T.; KRUSE, L. I.; EGGLESTON, D.; SAXTY, B. A.; WELLS, T. N.; GROOT, P. H., "Synthesis of novel thiol-containing citric acid analogues. Kinetic evaluation of these and other potential active-site-directed and mechanism-based inhibitors of ATP citrate lyase", J MED CHEM, (1995), vol. 38, doi:doi:10.1021/jm00003a016, pages 537 - 543, XP009059143 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm00003a016 | - ELSHOURBAGY, N. A.; NEAR, J. C.; KMETZ, P. J.; SATHE, G. M.; SOUTHAN, C.; STRICKLER, J. E.; GROSS, M.; YOUNG, J. F.; WELLS, T. N.;, "Rat ATP citrate lyase. Molecular cloning and sequence analysis of a full-length cDNA and mRNA abundance as a function of diet, organ, and age", J BIOL CHEM, (1990), vol. 265, pages 1430 - 1435 | - ELSHOURBAGY, N. A.; NEAR, J. C.; KMETZ, P. J.; WELLS, T. N.; GROOT, P. H.; SAXTY, B. A.; HUGHES, S. A.; FRANKLIN, M.; GLOGER, 1. S, "Cloning and expression of a human ATP-citrate lyase cDNA", EUR J BIOCHEM, (1992), vol. 204, pages 491 - 499 | - FANG, M.; LOWENSTEIN, J. M., "Citrate and the conversion of carbohydrate into fat. The regulation of fatty acid synthesis by rat liver extracts", BIOCHEM J, (1967), vol. 105, pages 803 - 811 | - FRAUWIRTH, K. A.; RILEY, J. L.; HARRIS, M. H.; PARRY, R. V.; RATHMELL, J. C.; PLAS, D. R.; ELSTROM, R. L.; JUNE, C. H.; THOMPSON,, "The CD28 signaling pathway regulates glucose metabolism", IMMUNITY, (2002), vol. 16, pages 769 - 777 | - FUKUDA, H.; IRITANI, N., "Regulation of ATP citrate lyase gene expression in hepatocytes and adipocytes in normal and genetically obese rats", J BIOCHEM (TOKYO, (1999), vol. 126, pages 437 - 444 | - GRIBBLE, A. D.; DOLL, R. E.; SHAW, A.; MCNAIR, D.; NOVELLI, R.; NOVELLI, C. E.; SLINGSBY, B. P.; SHAH, V. P.; TEW, D.; SAXTY, B. A, "ATP-citrate lyase as a target for hypolipidemic intervention. Design and synthesis of 2-substituted butanedioic acids as novel, potent inhibitors of the enzyme", J MED CHEM, (1996), vol. 39, doi:doi:10.1021/jm960167w, pages 3569 - 3584, XP055135333 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm960167w | - GRIBBLE, A. D.; IFE, R. J.; SHAW, A.; MCNAIR, D.; NOVELLI, C. E.; BAKEWELL, S.; SHAH, V. P.; DOLLE, R. E.; GROOT, P. H.; PEARCE, N, "ATP-Citrate lyase as a target for hypolipidemic intervention. 2. Synthesis and evaluation of (3R,5S)-omega-substituted-3- carboxy-3, 5-dihydroxyalkanoic acids and their gamma-lactone prodrugs as inhibitors of the enzyme in vitro and in vivo", J MED CHEM, (1998), vol. 41, pages 3582 - 3595 | - INOUE, J.; SUZUKI, F.; FUKUNISHI, K.; ADACHI, K.; TAKEDA, Y., "Studies on ATP citrate lyase of rat liver", J BIOL CHEM, (1966), vol. 60, pages 543 - 553 | - LOWENSTEIN, J. M., "Effect of (-)-hydroxycitrate on fatty acid synthesis by rat liver in vivo", J BIOL CHEM, (1971), vol. 246, pages 629 - 632 | - MORIKAWA, J.; NISHIMURA, Y.; UCHIDA, A.; TANAKA, T., "Molecular cloning of novel mouse and human putative citrate lyase beta-subunit", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMMUN, (2001), vol. 289, pages 1282 - 1286 | - PEARCE, N. J.; YATES, J. W.; BERKHOUT, T. A.; JACKSON, B.; TEW, D.; BOYD, H.; CAMILLERI, P.; SWEENEY, P.; GRIBBLE, A. D.; SHAW, A., "The role of ATP citrate lyase in the metabolic regulation of plasma lipids. Hypolipidaemic effects of SB-204990, a lactone prodrug of the potent ATP citrate lyase inhibitor SB-201076", BIOCHEM J, (1998), vol. 334, pages 113 - 119, XP008125902 | - PLAS, D. R.; TALAPATRA, S.; EDINGER, A. L.; RATHMELL, J. C.; THOMPSON, C. B., "Akt and Bel-XL promote growth factor-independent survival through distinct effects on mitochondrial physiology", J BIOL CHEM, (2001), vol. 276, pages 12041 - 12048 | - SAXTY, B. A.; NOVELLI, R.; DOLLE, R. E.; KRUSE, L. I.; REID, D. G.; CAMILLERI, P.; WELLS, T. N., "Synthesis and evaluation of (+) and (-)-2,2-difluorocitrate as inhibitors of rat- liver ATP-citrate lyase and porcine-heart aconitase", EUR J BIOCHEM, (1991), vol. 202, pages 889 - 896 | - SULLIVAN, A. C.; TRISCARI, J.; HAMILTON, J. G.; MILLER, O. N.; WHEATLEY, V. R., "Effect of (-)-hydroxycitrate upon the accumulation of lipid in the rat. I. Lipogenesis", LIPIDS, (1974), vol. 9, pages 121 - 128 | - SULLIVAN, A. C.; TRISCARI, J.; HAMILTON, J. G.; MILLER, O. N., "Effect of (-)-hydroxycitrate upon the accumulation of lipid in the rat. II", APPETITE. LIPIDS, (1974), vol. 9, pages 129 - 134 | - SULLIVAN, A. C.; DAIRMAN, W.; TRISCARI, J., "threo-Chlorocitric acid: a novel anorectic agent", PHARMACOL BIOCHEM BEHAV, (1981), vol. 15, pages 303 - 310 | - VANDER HEIDEN, M. G.; CHANDEL, N. S.; WILLIAMSON, E. K.; SCHUMACKER, P. T.; THOMPSON, C. B., "Bel-xL regulates the membrane potential and volume homeostasis of mitochondria", CELL, (1997), vol. 91, pages 627 - 637 | - VANDER HEIDEN, M. G.; PLAS, D. R.; RATHMELL, J. C.; FOX, C. J.; HARRIS, M. H.; THOMPSON, C. B., "Growth factors can influence cell growth and survival through effects on glucose metabolism", MOL CELL BIOL, (2001), vol. 21, pages 5899 - 5912 | - WATSON, J. A.; LOWENSTEIN, J. M., "Citrate and the conversion of carbohydrate into fat. Fatty acid synthesis by a combination of cytoplasm and mitochondria", J BIOL CHEM, (1970), vol. 245, pages 5993 - 6002 |