EP2767307 - Device for the treatment of an ocular disease [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eyevensys 67 Rue Saint-Jacques 75005 Paris / FR | [2014/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lebreton, Luc 3 rue Saint Laurent 21121 Daix / FR | 02 /
Benard, Romain 45bis rue de la Folie Régnault 75011 Paris / FR | 03 /
Touchard, Elodie 15 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | 04 /
Behar-Cohen, Francine 15 rue de l'Ecole de Médecine 75006 Paris / FR | [2014/34] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Nony 11 rue Saint-Georges 75009 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Nony 3, rue de Penthièvre 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13155682.1 | 18.02.2013 | [2014/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2767307 | Date: | 20.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | A61N1/32, A61N1/36, A61F9/00, A61N1/04 | [2014/34] | CPC: |
A61N1/0424 (EP);
A61F9/0017 (EP);
A61N1/327 (EP);
A61F9/0026 (EP);
A61N1/36046 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/34] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Behandlung einer Augenerkrankung | [2014/34] | English: | Device for the treatment of an ocular disease | [2014/34] | French: | Dispositif pour le traitement d'une maladie oculaire | [2014/34] | Examination procedure | 18.02.2013 | Examination requested [2014/34] | 21.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2011152749 (TOUCHARD ELODIE [FR] ET AL) [X] 1 * abstract * * paragraphs [0004] - [0015] - [0 63] - [0068] - [ 106] - [0110] - [ 123] - [0133] - [ 149] - [0155] - [ 183] - [0199] * [A] 2-14; | [A]US2010268150 (MOHANTY SAMARENDA K [US] ET AL) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0018] - [0023] - [0 30] , [0 48] , [0 54]; claims 1, 7-8, 15-20 *; | [A]US2012302972 (HIGUCHI JOHN W [US]) [A] 1-14 * abstract * * paragraphs [0006] - [0008] - [0 65] - [0075] *; | [E]WO2013024436 (INST NAT SANTE RECH MED [FR]; BEHAR-COHEN FRANCINE [FR]) [E] 1-14 * abstract * * page 3, line 17 - page 8, line 29 * * page 9, line 30 - page 20, line 7 * |