EP2597053 - Device for binding at least one item [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/22] | Free end band and seal | ||
[2015/18] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.08.2016 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Band-It-IDEX, Inc. 4799 Dahlia Street Denver Colorado 80216 / US | [2013/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ingalls, Douglas J. 121 Fawn Drive Bailey, CO Colorado 80421 / US | 02 /
Tran, Bai Kiet 12832 King Street Broomfield, Colorado 80020 / US | 03 /
Grant, Dan 17262 Parkside Drive S Commerce City, Colorado 80022 / US | 04 /
Swetlic, Brian 12444 West 61st Avenue Arvada, CO Colorado 80004 / US | 05 /
Mossbrucker, Mark 7902 South Carr Court Littleton, CO Colorado 80128 / US | 06 /
Nelson, Daniel J. 2545 Benton Street Edgewater, CO Colorado 80214 / US | 07 /
Leist, Rene 3480 South Cherry Street Denver, CO Colorado 80222 / US | [2013/34] |
Former [2013/22] | 01 /
Ingalls, Douglas J. 121 Fawn Drive Bailey, CO Colorado 80421 / US | ||
02 /
Tran, Bai Kiet 601 West 11th Avenue, 216 Denver, CO Colorado 80204 / US | |||
03 /
Grant, Dan 18694 East Progress Avenue Centennial, CO Colorado 80015 / US | |||
04 /
Swetlic, Brian 12444 West 61st Avenue Arvada, CO Colorado 80004 / US | |||
05 /
Mossbrucker, Mark 7902 South Carr Court Littleton, CO Colorado 80128 / US | |||
06 /
Nelson, Daniel J. 2545 Benton Street Edgewater, CO Colorado 80214 / US | |||
07 /
Leist, Rene 3480 South Cherry Street Denver, CO Colorado 80222 / US | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2015/40] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | ||
Former [2013/22] | Price, Paul Anthony King D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 13155726.6 | 07.06.2007 | [2013/22] | Priority number, date | US20060422854 | 07.06.2006 Original published format: US 422854 | [2013/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2597053 | Date: | 29.05.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2597053 | Date: | 30.09.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/40] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D63/02 | [2013/22] | CPC: |
B65D63/06 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1457 (EP,US);
Y10T24/1465 (EP,US);
Y10T24/49 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/40] |
Former [2013/22] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Mittel um mindestens einen Gegenstand zu binden | [2015/21] | English: | Device for binding at least one item | [2015/18] | French: | Moyen pour lier au moins un objet | [2015/18] |
Former [2013/22] | Band mit freiem Ende and Verbinder | ||
Former [2013/22] | Free end band and seal | ||
Former [2013/22] | Bande avec une extrémité libre et un joint | Examination procedure | 29.11.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2013 | Examination requested [2014/02] | 30.01.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.04.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 22.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP07798204.9 / EP2029452 | Opposition(s) | 01.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 17.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 30.06.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.06.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 30.09.2015 | BG | 30.09.2015 | CY | 30.09.2015 | EE | 30.09.2015 | LT | 30.09.2015 | LV | 30.09.2015 | MC | 30.09.2015 | PL | 30.09.2015 | RO | 30.09.2015 | SI | 30.09.2015 | SK | 30.09.2015 | TR | 30.09.2015 | GR | 31.12.2015 | IS | 30.01.2016 | PT | 01.02.2016 | IE | 07.06.2016 | LU | 07.06.2016 | MT | 30.06.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/32] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
MT | 30.06.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
CY | 30.09.2015 | ||
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
TR | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
LU | 07.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
IE | 07.06.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
MC | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SI | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 30.09.2015 | |
EE | 30.09.2015 | ||
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
PL | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
PT | 01.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | EE | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
RO | 30.09.2015 | ||
SK | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | EE | 30.09.2015 | |
LT | 30.09.2015 | ||
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
IS | 30.01.2016 | ||
Former [2016/09] | LT | 30.09.2015 | |
LV | 30.09.2015 | ||
GR | 31.12.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 30.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US905587 (ROOT IPSELANTI O [US]) [X] 1-7* page 1, line 38 - line 53; figure 1; claim 1 *; | [X]US2528376 (MACKENZIE ALEXANDER S) [X] 1-7 * page 1, column 2, line 23 - line 44; figures 2-4; claim 1 * |