Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2597066 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2597066



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 414
13.10.2021 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
21.12.2020 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
12.11.2020 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
30.10.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
30.10.2020 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
30.10.2020 French translation of claims Search / examination 4
30.10.2020 German translation of the claims Search / examination 5
30.10.2020 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
24.06.2020 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
24.06.2020 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
24.06.2020 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
24.06.2020 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 29
24.06.2020 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 29
27.11.2019 Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.11.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.11.2019 Enquiry as to the processing of the file Search / examination 1
13.11.2019 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
21.10.2019 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
11.03.2019 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 3
03.07.2018 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
07.07.2016 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 5
07.07.2016 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 16
07.07.2016 Claims Search / examination 5
07.07.2016 Description Search / examination 16
07.07.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
07.07.2016 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
17.05.2016 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
11.05.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
11.05.2016 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
11.05.2016 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.01.2016 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
13.01.2016 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.07.2015 Examination started Search / examination 1
26.11.2013 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
26.11.2013 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 4
26.11.2013 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 4
26.11.2013 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
26.11.2013 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 2
26.11.2013 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 2
26.11.2013 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.11.2013 Communication of amended entries concerning the representative Search / examination 1
06.11.2013 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
04.06.2013 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 2
03.05.2013 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 2
12.04.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
12.04.2013 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.04.2013 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
22.03.2013 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
22.03.2013 European search opinion Search / examination 3
22.03.2013 European search report Search / examination 2
19.02.2013 Abstract Search / examination 1
19.02.2013 Acknowledgement of receipt of electronic submission of the request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 2
19.02.2013 Claims Search / examination 4
19.02.2013 Description Search / examination 16
19.02.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2013 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
19.02.2013 Drawings Search / examination 8
19.02.2013 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 1
19.02.2013 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 5
29.01.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 153
17.12.2007 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 35