EP2632120 - Label plate for a mobile terminal [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 05.01.2018 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.02.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.01.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 07.02.2018 [2018/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | For all designated states LG Electronics, Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeoungdeungpo-gu Seoul, 150-721 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Mintae 402, 409-254, Sillimbon-Dong, Gwanak-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Lim, Hyounwook World Merdiang Apt. 101-1302, 33-11, Jamwon-Dong Seocho-Gu Seoul / KR | 03 /
Jang, Changyong Woojangsan I-Park e-Pyeonhansesang Apt. 106-1201 Woojangsan-Dong, Gangseo-Gu Seoul / KR | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 104 Rue de Richelieu CS92104 75080 Paris Cedex 02 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | Cabinet Plasseraud 52, rue de la Victoire 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 13155866.0 | 19.02.2013 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | KR20120019862 | 27.02.2012 Original published format: KR 20120019862 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2632120 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/02, H04B1/38 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
H04B1/3816 (EP,US);
H04B1/3818 (KR);
H04M1/0202 (US);
G06K13/0831 (US);
H04M1/0274 (EP,KR,US);
H05K5/0252 (KR);
| C-Set: |
H04M2250/00, H04M1/026 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Bezeichnungsschild für ein mobiles Endgerät | [2013/35] | English: | Label plate for a mobile terminal | [2013/35] | French: | Plaque indicatrice pour un terminal mobile | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | 19.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 28.02.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/06] | 26.09.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2018/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPH10154210 (KYOCERA CORP) [I] 1-15 * abstract *; | [I]US2004082210 (WALLACE ROBERT F [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-6,9 * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0016] - paragraph [0020] *; | [I]US2007060198 (KUO CHUNG-HUA [TW]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-3 * * paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0013] * * paragraph [0020] - paragraph [0023] * * paragraph [0032] *; | [A]EP1916776 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [I]US2009002933 (HUBERT JONATHAN [US], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 5-10 * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0021] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0041] - paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0048] - paragraph [0053] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0057] * * paragraph [0059] *; | [I]US2010068937 (CHEN YEN-WEI [TW]) [I] 1-15 * abstract * * figures 1-5 * * paragraph [0003] * * paragraph [0005] * * paragraph [0009] * * paragraph [0027] - paragraph [0032] * |