EP2631436 - Steam turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.11.2018 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.07.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.11.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 12.12.2018 [2018/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kabushiki Kaisha Toshiba 1-1, Shibaura 1-Chome Minato-Ku Tokyo 105-8001 / JP | [2013/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Saeki, Hiroshi Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 02 /
Uchida, Tatsuro Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 03 /
Shibukawa, Naoki Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | 04 /
Imai, Kenichi Intellectual Property Division, Toshiba Corporation 1-1, Shibaura 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo, 105-8001 / JP | [2013/35] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/35] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13156130.0 | 21.02.2013 | [2013/35] | Priority number, date | JP20120038725 | 24.02.2012 Original published format: JP 2012038725 | [2013/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2631436 | Date: | 28.08.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2631436 | Date: | 13.12.2017 | Language: | EN | [2017/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2017 | Classification | IPC: | F01D25/30 | [2013/35] | CPC: |
F01D1/04 (EP,US);
F01D25/30 (EP);
F01D3/02 (US);
F05D2220/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/35] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Dampfturbine | [2013/35] | English: | Steam turbine | [2013/35] | French: | Turbine à vapeur | [2013/35] | Examination procedure | 21.02.2013 | Examination requested [2013/35] | 14.06.2018 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2018/50] | 23.07.2018 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time [2018/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]SU916770 (GUDKOV EDUARD [SU], et al) [X] 1,2 * figures 1, 2; claim 1 * * column 1, line 3 - column 3, line 19 *; | [A]US5518366 (GRAY LEWIS [US]) [A] 1,2 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2006329148 (HITACHI LTD) [A] 1,2 * the whole document * |