EP2769927 - Tamper evident closure system for bottles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IS | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Bericap Kapak Sanayi Anonim Sirketi Beylikbagi Mah. Celikoglu Cad. NO:155, Gebze Kocaeli / TR | [2014/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kutlug, Gürer BERICAP KAPAK SANAYI ANONIM SIRKETI Beylikbagi Mah. Celikoglu Cad. NO:155, Gebze Kocaeli / TR | 02 /
Oltulu, Burak BERICAP KAPAK SANAYI ANONIM SIRKETI Beylikbagi Mah. Celikoglu Cad. NO:155, Gebze Kocaeli / TR | 03 /
Akin, Özgür BERICAP KAPAK SANAYI ANONIM SIRKETI Beylikbagi Mah. Celikoglu Cad. NO:155, Gebze Kocaeli / TR | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Sevinç, Erkan Istanbul Patent A.S. Plaza-33, Büyükdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | [2016/15] |
Former [2014/35] | Sevinç, Erkan Istanbul Patent & Trademark Consultancy Ltd. Plaza 33, Buyukdere Cad. No: 33/16 Sisli 34381 Istanbul / TR | Application number, filing date | 13156202.7 | 21.02.2013 | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769927 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2769927 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B65D41/62, B65D49/04 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
B65D41/62 (EP);
B65D49/04 (EP);
B65D2401/30 (EP);
B65D2401/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2014/35] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Sicherheitsverschlusssystem für Flaschen | [2014/35] | English: | Tamper evident closure system for bottles | [2014/35] | French: | Système de fermeture inviolable pour bouteilles | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 25.02.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2015 | Examination requested [2015/15] | 26.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 22.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | HR | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | MK | 13.04.2016 | NL | 13.04.2016 | RS | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | SM | 13.04.2016 | NO | 13.07.2016 | IS | 13.08.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2020/33] |
Former [2019/51] | AL | 13.04.2016 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
MK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2019/46] | AL | 13.04.2016 | |
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 13.04.2016 | |
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/48] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
SM | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | DK | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/04] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
HR | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RS | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
NL | 13.04.2016 | ||
NO | 13.07.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | |
NO | 13.07.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP1679268 (PLASTIVIT SA [ES]) [X] 1,3,8,11,12 * paragraph [0013] - paragraph [0014]; figures 1,3,6 * [A] 2,7,9 [I] 4-6,10,13 | by applicant | EP1602591 | EP1392575 | WO2008041119 | EP1981774 |