EP2618188 - Illumination optical apparatus, exposure apparatus, and exposure method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/30] | Polarization-modulating element, illumination optical apparatus, exposure apparatus, and exposure method | ||
[2015/28] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.08.2016 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 15-3, Konan 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6290 / JP | [2015/36] |
Former [2013/30] | For all designated states Nikon Corporation 12-1, Yurakucho 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8331 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tanitsu, Osamu c/o NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8331 / JP | 02 /
Shigematsu, Koji c/o NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8331 / JP | 03 /
Hirota, Hiroyuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8331 / JP | 04 /
Matsuyama, Tomoyuki c/o NIKON CORPORATION 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8331 / JP | [2013/30] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2015/41] |
Former [2013/30] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13156324.9 | 14.01.2005 | [2013/30] | Priority number, date | JP20040030555 | 06.02.2004 Original published format: JP 2004030555 | JP20040358218 | 10.12.2004 Original published format: JP 2004358218 | [2013/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2618188 | Date: | 24.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2618188 | Date: | 07.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/30, G03F7/20, H01L21/027 | [2013/30] | CPC: |
G03F7/70566 (EP,KR,US);
G03F7/2006 (KR);
F21V13/02 (EP,KR,US);
F21V9/14 (KR,US);
G02B27/0977 (US);
G02B27/286 (EP,KR,US);
G02B5/3025 (US);
G03F7/70058 (KR);
G03F7/701 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2015/41] |
Former [2013/30] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, MC, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Optisches Beleuchtungsgerät, Belichtungsgerät und Belichtungsverfahren | [2015/28] | English: | Illumination optical apparatus, exposure apparatus, and exposure method | [2015/28] | French: | Appareil optique d'illumination, appareil d'exposition et procédé d'exposition | [2015/28] |
Former [2013/30] | Polarisierungsmodulationslement, optisches Beleuchtungsgerät, Belichtungsgerät und Belichtungsverfahren | ||
Former [2013/30] | Polarization-modulating element, illumination optical apparatus, exposure apparatus, and exposure method | ||
Former [2013/30] | Élément de modulation-polarisation, appareil optique dýillumination, appareil dýexposition et procédé dýexposition | Examination procedure | 21.01.2014 | Examination requested [2014/10] | 22.01.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M03) | 11.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.10.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 22.04.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2015 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 10.08.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 27.08.2015 | Information about intention to grant a patent | 27.08.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP05703646.9 / EP1720047 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20050703646) is 15.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 08.07.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 20.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 15.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.01.2005 | AT | 07.10.2015 | BE | 07.10.2015 | BG | 07.10.2015 | CY | 07.10.2015 | CZ | 07.10.2015 | DK | 07.10.2015 | EE | 07.10.2015 | ES | 07.10.2015 | FI | 07.10.2015 | LT | 07.10.2015 | MC | 07.10.2015 | PL | 07.10.2015 | RO | 07.10.2015 | SE | 07.10.2015 | SI | 07.10.2015 | SK | 07.10.2015 | TR | 07.10.2015 | GR | 08.01.2016 | GB | 14.01.2016 | LU | 14.01.2016 | CH | 31.01.2016 | LI | 31.01.2016 | IS | 07.02.2016 | PT | 08.02.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 14.01.2005 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
TR | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 14.01.2005 | |
AT | 07.10.2015 | ||
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CY | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
BE | 07.10.2015 | ||
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SI | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
GB | 14.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
CH | 31.01.2016 | ||
LI | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/42] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
MC | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/39] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
DK | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
LU | 14.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
EE | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
RO | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
SK | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/34] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
CZ | 07.10.2015 | ||
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 07.10.2015 | |
ES | 07.10.2015 | ||
FI | 07.10.2015 | ||
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
PL | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
GR | 08.01.2016 | ||
BE | 31.01.2016 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
PT | 08.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
SE | 07.10.2015 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/22] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | ||
IS | 07.02.2016 | ||
Former [2016/20] | ES | 07.10.2015 | |
LT | 07.10.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]EP0764858 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [X] 1,18,20,22,24 * abstract * * column 5, line 27 - column 7, line 44 * * figures 3a,3b,5 * [I] 2-17,19,21,23; | [A]EP0937999 (ZEISS CARL [DE], et al) [A] 1-24 * abstract * * paragraph [0016] * * figure 1 *; | [A]GB856621 (NAT RES DEV) [A] 1-24 * figure 4 * * page 3, lines 11-61 * | Examination | JPH0653120 | by applicant | JP3246615B | WO9949504 | JPH06124873 | JPH10303114 | - TSURUTA, "Pencil of Light-Applied Optics for optical engineers", K.K. SHINGIJUTSU COMMUNICATIONS |