EP2634230 - HOT-MELT SINGLE-COMPONENT PUTTY FOR SEALING INSULATING GLASS PANES OR PHOTOVOLTAIC PANELS, AND INSULATING MODULE INCLUDING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2013/36] | Hot-melt single-component putty for sealing insulating glass panes or photovoltaic panels, and insulating module including same | ||
[2016/13] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 23.12.2016 Database last updated on 15.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.12.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.01.2017 [2017/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LE JOINT FRANCAIS 2, rue Balzac 75008 Paris / FR | [2013/36] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Canova, Pierre 30 avenue Alphand 94160 Saint-Mande / FR | 02 /
Napoletano, Claire 18 rue du Petit Pont 95530 La Frette sur Seine / FR | 03 /
Coralie, Mickaël 526 rue Paul Chesnel 45700 Pannes / FR | 04 /
Carniol, Natacha 50 rue d'Anjou 45200 Amilly / FR | [2013/36] | Representative(s) | Gevers & Orès Immeuble le Palatin 2 3 Cours du Triangle CS 80165 92939 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/36] | Bolinches, Michel Jean-Marie, et al Cabinet Orès 36, rue de St Pétersbourg 75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 13156390.0 | 22.02.2013 | [2013/36] | Priority number, date | FR20120051862 | 29.02.2012 Original published format: FR 1251862 | [2013/36] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2634230 | Date: | 04.09.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/36] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2634230 | Date: | 16.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.09.2013 | Classification | IPC: | C09K3/10, C03C27/10, C09J123/22, E06B3/00 | [2013/36] | CPC: |
C03C27/10 (EP);
C08L23/16 (EP);
C09K3/10 (EP);
E06B3/66342 (EP);
C08L2205/025 (EP);
C08L2205/035 (EP);
C09K2200/0612 (EP);
C09K2200/0617 (EP);
C09K2200/062 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/16, C08L23/04, C08L23/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/36] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HEIßSCHMELZ-EINKOMPONENTENKLEBSTOFF ZUM ABDICHTEN VON ISOLIERGLASSCHEIBEN ODER FOTOVOLTAIKPANEELEN, UND DIESEN ENTHALTENDES ISOLIERMODUL | [2016/13] | English: | HOT-MELT SINGLE-COMPONENT PUTTY FOR SEALING INSULATING GLASS PANES OR PHOTOVOLTAIC PANELS, AND INSULATING MODULE INCLUDING SAME | [2016/13] | French: | MASTIC MONO-COMPOSANT THERMOFUSIBLE POUR SCELLER DES VITRAGES ISOLANTS OU DES PANNEAUX PHOTOVOLTAÏQUES, ET MODULE ISOLANT L'INCORPORANT. | [2016/13] |
Former [2013/36] | Heißschmelz-Einkomponentenklebstoff zum Abdichten von Isolierglasscheiben oder Fotovoltaikpaneelen, und diesen enthaltendes Isoliermodul | ||
Former [2013/36] | Hot-melt single-component putty for sealing insulating glass panes or photovoltaic panels, and insulating module including same | ||
Former [2013/36] | Mastic mono-composant thermofusible pour sceller des vitrages isolants ou des panneaux photovoltaïques, et module isolant l'incorporant. | Examination procedure | 09.04.2014 | Examination requested [2014/21] | 10.04.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.07.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.07.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/04] | 06.09.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2017/04] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.06.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2016 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2006235156 (GRISWOLD ROY M [US], et al) [X] 1-6,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0001] - [0010] - [0017] - [0019] - [0029] , [0036] , [0040]; example - * [I] 7-11,13; | [XI]US2008039576 (GRISWOLD ROY M [US], et al) [X] 1-3,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0004] - [0012] - [0017] , [0018] , [0023] - [0025] - [0027] , [0076]; example -; table 1 * [I] 4-11,13; | [XI]US2007154663 (WANG BING [US], et al) [X] 1,3,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0013] , [0042] - [0054] - [0060] - [0068]; claims 1,7-12 * [I] 4-11,13; | [XI]US2007270541 (DAVISON ANTHONY P [GB], et al) [X] 1,2,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0002] - [0007] - [0010] - [0012] - [0024]; claims 1,5 * [I] 3-11,13 |