EP2612640 - Tampon applicator [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 11.07.2014 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.07.2014 | Withdrawal of application | published on 13.08.2014 [2014/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PLAYTEX PRODUCTS, INC. 300 Nyala Farms Road Westport, CT 06880 / US | [2013/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Dane R. 18 Leary Avenue Bloomingdale, NJ 07403 / US | 02 /
Siracusa, Paul A. 13 Orchard Hill Vista Florida, NJ 10921 / US | 03 /
Edgett, Keith 2 Rosewood Court Ramsey, NJ 07446 / US | [2013/28] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/28] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 13156481.7 | 25.04.2002 | [2013/28] | Priority number, date | US20010894042 | 28.06.2001 Original published format: US 894042 | [2013/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2612640 | Date: | 10.07.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/28] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2612640 | Date: | 11.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/20 | [2013/28] | CPC: |
A61F13/26 (EP,US);
Y10S604/904 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2013/28] | Title | German: | Tamponapplikator | [2013/28] | English: | Tampon applicator | [2013/28] | French: | Applicateur de tampon | [2013/28] | Examination procedure | 04.07.2014 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2014/33] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02780941.7 / EP1401367 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20020780941) is 22.02.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 19.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 28.04.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6248089 (PORAT GAD [IL]) [A] 1-20 * column 5, lines 31-34 * * column 7, lines 18-32; figure -; claim - *; | [XDY]US4536178 (LICHSTEIN BERNARD [US], et al) [XD] 1-7 * the whole document * [Y] 8-20; | [Y]DE2755012 (UNILEVER NV) [Y] 8-20 * figure 1; claim - *; | [A]US6045526 (JACKSON DANE R [US]) [A] 1-20 * column 3, lines 24-34 *; | [A]US5931803 (JACKSON DANE R [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US5709652 (HAGERTY ANDREW J [US]) [A] 1-20 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]GB2166656 (KAO CORP) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2587717 (FOURNESS CHARLES A) [A] 1-20 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]US2489502 (RUTH HOWARD M) [A] 1-20 * figure -; claim - * | by applicant | US6045526 | US5395308 | US5290501 | US4573964 | US4573963 | US4891042 | US4412833 | US3895634 | US3628533 | US2922423 | US2587717 | US2489502 | US3575169 | US4536178 |