EP2769785 - Refractory impact pad [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.04.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2019 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MK | published on 18.12.2019 [2019/51] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstraße 11 1100 Wien / AT | [N/P] |
Former [2014/35] | For all designated states Refractory Intellectual Property GmbH & Co. KG Wienerbergstrasse 11 1100 Wien / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hackl, Dr. Gernot Hauptstr. 42 8793 Trofalach / AT | 02 /
Lukesch, Ing. Gernot Ostererweg 28c 8700 Leoben / AT | [2014/35] | Representative(s) | Becker, Thomas Patentanwälte Becker & Müller Turmstrasse 22 40878 Ratingen / DE | [2014/35] | Application number, filing date | 13156501.2 | 25.02.2013 | [2014/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2769785 | Date: | 27.08.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2769785 | Date: | 15.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.02.2014 | Classification | IPC: | B22D41/00 | [2014/35] | CPC: |
B22D41/003 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/35] | Title | German: | Refraktärer Aufpralldämpfer | [2014/35] | English: | Refractory impact pad | [2014/35] | French: | Tampon d'impact réfractaire | [2014/35] | Examination procedure | 11.06.2014 | Examination requested [2014/35] | 09.10.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.03.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 23.03.2016 | Opposition(s) | 16.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/21] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 15.06.2016 | CY | 15.06.2016 | DK | 15.06.2016 | EE | 15.06.2016 | FI | 15.06.2016 | HR | 15.06.2016 | LT | 15.06.2016 | MC | 15.06.2016 | MK | 15.06.2016 | NL | 15.06.2016 | RS | 15.06.2016 | SM | 15.06.2016 | IS | 15.10.2016 | PT | 17.10.2016 | IE | 25.02.2017 | MT | 25.02.2017 | [2019/51] |
Former [2019/46] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
CY | 15.06.2016 | ||
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/46] | AL | 15.06.2016 | |
DK | 15.06.2016 | ||
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/43] | DK | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
MT | 25.02.2017 | ||
Former [2018/13] | DK | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
IE | 25.02.2017 | ||
Former [2017/48] | DK | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
MC | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/38] | DK | 15.06.2016 | |
EE | 15.06.2016 | ||
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
SM | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
PT | 17.10.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | EE | 15.06.2016 | |
FI | 15.06.2016 | ||
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
IS | 15.10.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
NL | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
HR | 15.06.2016 | ||
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
RS | 15.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 15.06.2016 | |
LT | 15.06.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 15.06.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0847821 (UGINE SAVOIE SA [FR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-5; claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO2012012853 (MAGNESITA REFRATARIOS S A [BR], et al) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-6; claims 1-5 *; | [A]EP1526940 (REFRACTORY INTELLECTUAL PROP [AT]) [A] 1-15 * figures 1-4; claims 1-19 *; | [A]USRE35685E (SCHMIDT MANFRED [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * column 2, lines 7-19 * * columns 4-5 * * figures 1-11 *; | [AD]WO9513890 (CCPI INC [US]) [AD] 1-15 * figures 1-6; claims 1-21 *; | [AD]WO2009048810 (VESUVIUS CRUCIBLE CO [US], et al) [AD] 1-15 * figures 1-16; claims 1-10 *; | [AD]WO03082499 (FOSECO INT [GB]) [AD] 1-15 * figures 1-31; claims 1-25 * | [A] - HAJDUK MICHAEL, "IMPACT PAD", DPMA ERFINDERAKTIVITÄTEN, PUBLIKATION DEUTSCHES PATENT- UND MARKENAMT, (2004), vol. 2003, pages 40 - 44, XP002440519 [A] 1-15 * page 43, line After_Fig.9 - page 44, line l * * figures 1-9 * |