EP2654256 - Transport system, central control computer, and transport method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.03.2016 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2015/10] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Hitachi Ltd. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mashimo, Daisuke c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Takahashi, Kiyotaka c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | 03 /
Shibata, Takeshi c/o Hitachi, Ltd., Intellectual Property Group 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo, 100-8220 / JP | [2013/43] | Representative(s) | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Patentanwälte PartG mbB Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | MERH-IP Matias Erny Reichl Hoffmann Paul-Heyse-Strasse 29 80336 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13157548.2 | 04.03.2013 | [2013/43] | Priority number, date | JP20120094010 | 17.04.2012 Original published format: JP 2012094010 | [2013/43] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2654256 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/43] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2654256 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2654256 | Date: | 13.05.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.11.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/701 | [2013/43] | CPC: |
H04L45/50 (EP,US);
H04L43/18 (US);
H04L45/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/43] | Title | German: | Transportsystem, zentraler Steuerungscomputer und Transportverfahren | [2013/43] | English: | Transport system, central control computer, and transport method | [2013/43] | French: | Système de transport, ordinateur central de commande et procédé de transport | [2013/43] | Examination procedure | 31.05.2013 | Examination requested [2013/43] | 04.06.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.07.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.11.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.01.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 22.01.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.01.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 10.07.2014 | Opposition(s) | 16.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 04.03.2013 | AL | 13.05.2015 | AT | 13.05.2015 | BE | 13.05.2015 | CY | 13.05.2015 | CZ | 13.05.2015 | DK | 13.05.2015 | EE | 13.05.2015 | ES | 13.05.2015 | FI | 13.05.2015 | HR | 13.05.2015 | IT | 13.05.2015 | LT | 13.05.2015 | LV | 13.05.2015 | MC | 13.05.2015 | MK | 13.05.2015 | NL | 13.05.2015 | PL | 13.05.2015 | RO | 13.05.2015 | RS | 13.05.2015 | SE | 13.05.2015 | SI | 13.05.2015 | SK | 13.05.2015 | SM | 13.05.2015 | TR | 13.05.2015 | BG | 13.08.2015 | NO | 13.08.2015 | GR | 14.08.2015 | IS | 13.09.2015 | PT | 14.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/31] | HU | 04.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MK | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
TR | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 04.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MK | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
TR | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 04.03.2013 | |
AT | 13.05.2015 | ||
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CY | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MK | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
SM | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
MT | 13.05.2015 | ||
NL | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SE | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
MC | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/37] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
BE | 13.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SI | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
IT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
CZ | 13.05.2015 | ||
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
PL | 13.05.2015 | ||
RO | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
SK | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
EE | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
DK | 13.05.2015 | ||
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/51] | AT | 13.05.2015 | |
ES | 13.05.2015 | ||
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
BG | 13.08.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
IS | 13.09.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 13.05.2015 | |
FI | 13.05.2015 | ||
HR | 13.05.2015 | ||
LT | 13.05.2015 | ||
LV | 13.05.2015 | ||
RS | 13.05.2015 | ||
NO | 13.08.2015 | ||
GR | 14.08.2015 | ||
PT | 14.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009285089 (SRINIVASAN SHRIRAM [US]) [A] 1-15* figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2011116385 (TURLINGTON MATTHEW W [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * figure 1; claims 9, 10 * |