EP2637226 - Phosphor encapsulating sheet, light emitting diode device, and producing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 03.06.2016 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.06.2016 | Withdrawal of application | published on 06.07.2016 [2016/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ebe, Yuki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
Ooyabu, Yasunari c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | 03 /
Noro, Hiroshi c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka, 567-8680 / JP | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/37] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 13157798.3 | 05.03.2013 | [2013/37] | Priority number, date | JP20120049007 | 06.03.2012 Original published format: JP 2012049007 | JP20130003080 | 11.01.2013 Original published format: JP 2013003080 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2637226 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.07.2013 | Classification | IPC: | H01L33/56 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (US);
H01L33/48 (KR);
H01L33/50 (EP,KR,US);
H01L33/52 (KR);
H01L33/56 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0002 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/0002, H01L2924/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2013/37] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Phosphoreinkapselungsblatt, lichtemittierende Diodenvorrichtung und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2013/37] | English: | Phosphor encapsulating sheet, light emitting diode device, and producing method thereof | [2013/37] | French: | Feuille d'encapsulation au phosphore, dispositif à diode électroluminescente et son procédé de production | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 28.02.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 11.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.05.2016 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2016/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2010328923 (SHAIKEVITCH ALEX [US]) [X] 1,7,9,10 * the whole document * [I] 2-6,8,11; | [XI]US2010327733 (SHAIKEVITCH ALEXANDER [US]) [X] 1,2,4,6,7,9 * the whole document * [I] 3,5,8,10,11; | [A]US2011309398 (ITO HISATAKA [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0037] , [0040] , [0058] , [0092] , [0130]; claims 1,5,7 *; | [A]US2011316032 (OOYABU YASUNARI [JP], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0062] , [0070] - [0083] - [0101] , [0105] - [0107] - [0116] *; | [A]WO2011140353 (INTELLILIGHT CORP [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0030] , [0034] - [0036] - [0065]; figures 1A-2C *; | [A]US2007004065 (SCHARDT CRAIG R [US], et al) [A] 1-11 * paragraphs [0006] - [0009] - [0018]; figure 1; claims 1-20 * | by applicant | JP2005093681 |