EP2636987 - An apparatus for pointing spatial coordinates, comprising a movable hand-held probe and a portable base unit, and a related method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.05.2016 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 21.11.2018 [2018/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Holding Prodim Systems B.V. Lagedijk 26 5705 BZ Helmond / NL | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Teune, René Lagedijk26 5705 BZ Helmond / NL | 02 /
Janssen, Antonius Johannes Lagedijk26 5705 BZ Helmond / NL | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Algemeen Octrooi- en Merkenbureau B.V. P.O. Box 645 5600 AP Eindhoven / NL | [2013/37] | Application number, filing date | 13157829.6 | 05.03.2013 | [2013/37] | Priority number, date | NL20122008435 | 08.03.2012 Original published format: NL 2008435 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2636987 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2636987 | Date: | 08.07.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.04.2013 | Classification | IPC: | G01B5/004 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G01B5/004 (EP,US);
G01B5/008 (US);
G01B21/04 (US);
G01B21/045 (US);
G01B21/047 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/28] |
Former [2013/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Vorrichtung mit einer beweglichen tragbaren Sonde und einer tragbaren Basiseinheit zum Zeigen von Raumkoordinaten sowie zugehöriges Verfahren | [2013/37] | English: | An apparatus for pointing spatial coordinates, comprising a movable hand-held probe and a portable base unit, and a related method | [2013/37] | French: | Appareil de pointage de coordonnées spatiales, comprenant une sonde à main mobile et une unité de base portable et procédé apparenté | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 04.03.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2014 | Examination requested [2014/16] | 15.04.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 26.08.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.06.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 01.06.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 15.04.2014 | Opposition(s) | 11.04.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 05.03.2013 | AL | 08.07.2015 | AT | 08.07.2015 | BE | 08.07.2015 | BG | 08.07.2015 | CY | 08.07.2015 | CZ | 08.07.2015 | DK | 08.07.2015 | EE | 08.07.2015 | ES | 08.07.2015 | FI | 08.07.2015 | HR | 08.07.2015 | IT | 08.07.2015 | LT | 08.07.2015 | LV | 08.07.2015 | MC | 08.07.2015 | MK | 08.07.2015 | NL | 08.07.2015 | PL | 08.07.2015 | RO | 08.07.2015 | RS | 08.07.2015 | SE | 08.07.2015 | SI | 08.07.2015 | SK | 08.07.2015 | SM | 08.07.2015 | TR | 08.07.2015 | NO | 08.10.2015 | GR | 09.10.2015 | IS | 08.11.2015 | PT | 09.11.2015 | IE | 05.03.2016 | LU | 05.03.2016 | CH | 31.03.2016 | LI | 31.03.2016 | MT | 31.03.2016 | [2018/47] |
Former [2018/38] | HU | 05.03.2013 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
BG | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 05.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/31] | HU | 05.03.2013 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 05.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
MT | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 05.03.2013 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
TR | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 05.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 05.03.2013 | |
AT | 08.07.2015 | ||
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CY | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MK | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
SM | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 05.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/41] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
MT | 08.07.2015 | ||
NL | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 05.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
IE | 05.03.2016 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
CH | 31.03.2016 | ||
LI | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
BE | 08.07.2015 | ||
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
MC | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/47] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
LU | 05.03.2016 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/36] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SI | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
BE | 31.03.2016 | ||
Former [2016/23] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RO | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
SK | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/22] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
CZ | 08.07.2015 | ||
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
EE | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
IT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/20] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
DK | 08.07.2015 | ||
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/11] | AT | 08.07.2015 | |
ES | 08.07.2015 | ||
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | ES | 08.07.2015 | |
FI | 08.07.2015 | ||
HR | 08.07.2015 | ||
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
PL | 08.07.2015 | ||
RS | 08.07.2015 | ||
SE | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
IS | 08.11.2015 | ||
PT | 09.11.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | FI | 08.07.2015 | |
LT | 08.07.2015 | ||
LV | 08.07.2015 | ||
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
GR | 09.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/08] | LT | 08.07.2015 | |
NO | 08.10.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | LT | 08.07.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5675514 (LEFEBVRE GUY [CA]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * column 2, lines 28-67 * * column 3, line 60 - column 4, line 35 * * column 7, lines 24-43 *; | [A]WO02057708 (AXYZ INTERNAT INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-15* abstract *; | [Y]NL1036517C (HOLDING PRODIM SYSTEMS B V [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * abstract * * page 14, line 1 - page 17, line 31 *; | [A]JP2010223754 (SHINRYO CORP) [A] 1-15 * abstract * | by applicant | US6785973 |