Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014140820 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2015 | A3 | WO2014140820 | 18.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2014135985 | Global Dossier | 09.04.2015 | A3 | WO2014135985 | 12.09.2014 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8652100 | Global Dossier | 18.02.2014 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8591463 | Global Dossier | 26.11.2013 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9827374 | Global Dossier | 28.11.2017 | B2 | US2014257191 | 11.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201314048601 | 08.10.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10232124 | Global Dossier | 19.03.2019 | B2 | US2018344941 | 06.12.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715691380 | 30.08.2017 | US201816059860 | 09.08.2018 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | US201314048601 | 08.10.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10071206 | Global Dossier | 11.09.2018 | B2 | US2017361025 | 21.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201715691380 | 30.08.2017 | US201314048601 | 08.10.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101780191B | Global Dossier | 21.09.2017 | B1 | KR20150126657 | 12.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101738889B | Global Dossier | 23.05.2017 | B1 | KR20150126395 | 11.11.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00913 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6073507B | Global Dossier | 01.02.2017 | B2 | JP2016513485 | 16.05.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6010238B | Global Dossier | 19.10.2016 | B2 | JP2016508807 | 24.03.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00913 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | IL240559 | Global Dossier | 30.06.2019 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2774639 | Global Dossier | 10.12.2014 | B1 | EP2774639 | 10.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2017201949 | Global Dossier | 13.04.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AU2017201949 | 22.03.2017 | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | AU2014229581 | 07.03.2014 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014229581B | Global Dossier | 22.12.2016 | B2 | AU2014229581 | 17.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2014224340B | Global Dossier | 22.12.2016 | B2 | AU2014224340 | 24.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00913 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR095068 | 16.09.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AR099534 | 03.08.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021548 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR112015021780 | 18.07.2017 | A2 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00913 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2808875 | 08.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2015002524 | 19.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CL2015002525 | 19.02.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1115934T | 25.01.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2774639T | 12.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA028936 | 31.01.2018 | B1 | EA201591664 | 30.12.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00913 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EA029122 | 28.02.2018 | B1 | EA201591666 | 29.01.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2527577T | 27.01.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20141218T | 27.02.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015011451 | 10.06.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX2015011453 | 04.08.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00913 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ630376 | 30.09.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ630468 | 28.04.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00913 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20151576 | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PE20151577 | 19.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2774639T | 31.07.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2774639E | 13.01.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS53741 | 30.06.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2774639T | 29.05.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201500002B | 05.03.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201442755 | 16.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TW201442756 | 16.11.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA113032 | 25.11.2016 | C2 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00913 | 07.03.2014 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UA113123 | 12.12.2016 | C2 | Priority number | Date | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY35373 | 29.05.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | UY35374 | 30.09.2015 | A | Priority number | Date | US201313790531 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA201506670 | 21.12.2016 | B | Priority number | Date | CA2808875 | 08.03.2013 | WO2014IB00860 | 07.03.2014 | US201313790487 | 08.03.2013 | EP13158407 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2774640 | Global Dossier | 31.12.2014 | B1 | EP2774640 | 10.09.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1116236T | 08.02.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2774640T | 02.02.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2529242T | 18.02.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20150035T | 27.02.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2774640T | 30.04.2015 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2774640E | 09.02.2015 | E | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | RS53779 | 30.06.2015 | B1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2774640T | 30.04.2015 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SMT201500021B | 05.03.2015 | B | Priority number | Date | EP13158439 | 08.03.2013 |