EP2777869 - Method for manufacturing a final component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.08.2015 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sulzer Metco AG Rigackerstrasse 16 5610 Wohlen / CH | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
van Wijk, Jan-Jaap Hoofdpoortplantsoen 9 3252 CP Goedereede / NL | 02 /
Cheaitany, Fouad Burgstrasse 89 8408 Winterthur / CH | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | IPS Irsch AG Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | Intellectual Property Services GmbH Langfeldstrasse 88 8500 Frauenfeld / CH | Application number, filing date | 13158493.0 | 11.03.2013 | [2014/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2777869 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | B23P15/00, B23K26/34, B23K26/38, C23C4/02, C23C4/04, C23C4/12, C23C4/18, // F04D29/28 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
B23P15/006 (EP);
B23K26/32 (EP);
B23K26/34 (EP);
C23C24/106 (EP);
C23C4/02 (EP);
C23C4/08 (EP);
C23C4/129 (EP);
C23C4/18 (EP);
F04D29/023 (EP);
F04D29/284 (EP);
F04D29/289 (EP);
B23K2101/001 (EP);
B23K2103/16 (EP);
B23K2103/18 (EP);
B23K2103/26 (EP);
F05D2230/234 (EP);
F05D2230/40 (EP);
F05D2230/90 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung eines End-Bauteils | [2014/38] | English: | Method for manufacturing a final component | [2014/38] | French: | Procédé de fabrication d'un composant final | [2014/38] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 18.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/39] | 28.04.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/39] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2010089201 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1,4-6,8 * page 4, line 25 - line 30 * * page 6, line 8 - line 31 * * figures 1,2; claims 1,3,7-10 * * the whole document * [Y] 2,3,7 [I] 10-13; | [X]US2007286958 (SLAUGHTER VICTOR BLAKEMORE [US]) [X] 1,6,9 * paragraphs [0006] , [0015] , [0016] , [0020]; figures 1,2 *; | [Y]US5938403 (OKADA RYOJI [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * figures 3,5,6,7,8,9 * * column 9, line 28 - line 34 * * column 12, line 17 - line 61 *; | [Y]US2007071907 (STILES ERIC [US], et al) [Y] 7 * figures 3,6,7,10 * * paragraphs [0009] , [0013] , [0062] , [0063] *; | [AD]DE102009032564 (MTU AERO ENGINES GMBH [DE]) [AD] 1-13 * paragraphs [0022] - [0024]; figure - *; | [A]JP2010229894 (HITACHI PLANT TECHNOLOGIES LTD) [A] 1-13 * abstract *; | [A]JP2001107833 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-13 * abstract * | by applicant | DE102009032564 |