Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] |
14.11.2016 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | |
17.06.2016 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | |
10.06.2016 | First examination report | |
22.04.2016 | Request for examination filed | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
22.04.2016 | Change - designated states | published on 25.05.2016 [2016/21] |
20.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant | |
30.03.2016 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
11.09.2015 | Publication of search report | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
11.09.2015 | Change - classification | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
11.09.2015 | Change - classification | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] |
27.03.2015 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
26.09.2014 | Change - representative | published on 29.10.2014 [2014/44] |
10.09.2013 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.09.2013 [2013/37] |