EP2637171 - Storage device having write signal with multiple-slope data transition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.11.2016 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2017 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.03.2017 [2017/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LSI Corporation 1621 Barber Lane Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [2013/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Livshitz, Boris 1130 Northwood Drive, 216 Eagan, MN 55121 / US | 02 /
Gleason, Jeffrey A. 2501 Kennelly Place Burnsville, MN 55337 / US | 03 /
Goldberg, Jason S. 1052 Fairmount Avenue Saint Paul, MN 55105 / US | 04 /
Mazur, Paul 7702 Hyde Avenue S. Cottage Grove, MN 55016 / US | 05 /
Rabe, Cameron C. 6249 Bolland Trail Inver Grove Heights, MN 55076 / US | [2013/37] | Representative(s) | Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Leonrodstraße 58 80636 München / DE | [2014/44] |
Former [2013/37] | Williams, David John Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 13158612.5 | 11.03.2013 | [2013/37] | Priority number, date | US201213416443 | 09.03.2012 Original published format: US201213416443 | [2013/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2637171 | Date: | 11.09.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2637171 | Date: | 14.10.2015 | Language: | EN | [2015/42] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.09.2015 | Classification | IPC: | G11B20/10, G11B5/02, G11B5/09 | [2013/37] | CPC: |
G11B20/10009 (EP,US);
G11B5/02 (EP,KR,US);
G11B5/09 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2016/21] |
Former [2013/37] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Speichervorrichtung mit Schreibsignal mit Mehrfachgefälle-Datenübergang | [2013/37] | English: | Storage device having write signal with multiple-slope data transition | [2013/37] | French: | Dispositif de stockage ayant un signal d'écriture avec transition de données multiple-inclinaison | [2013/37] | Examination procedure | 13.04.2016 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.04.2016 | Examination requested [2016/21] | 08.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.2016 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2017/12] | 15.11.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2017/12] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.06.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4376292 (MIGNOLET GEORGES M A [NL]) [X] 1-6,11-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 38-55 * * figure 3 *; | [X]US4503396 (FAWKES JOHN S [US]) [X] 1-6,11-15 * abstract * * column 3, lines 20-61 ** figure 3 * | by applicant | US7872825 |