EP2778554 - Shutoff valve for use in a conduit of an air conditioning system or a mechanical smoke ventilation assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 18.09.2015 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.09.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TROX GmbH Heinrich-Trox-Platz 1 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | [2014/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Vogelsang, Peter Am Clarenhof 15 50859 Köln / DE | 02 /
Glatz, Christian Pascalstraße 25 47506 Neukirchen-Vluyn / DE | 03 /
Weise, Michael An der Kranenweide 7 46419 Isselburg / DE | [2014/38] | Representative(s) | Dr. Stark & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/38] | DR. STARK & PARTNER Patentanwälte Moerser Straße 140 47803 Krefeld / DE | Application number, filing date | 13158622.4 | 11.03.2013 | [2014/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2778554 | Date: | 17.09.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/38] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2013 | Classification | IPC: | F24F13/14, A62C2/12, F24F11/00 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
A62C2/12 (EP);
F24F13/14 (EP);
F24F11/35 (EP);
F24F2221/30 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2014/38] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Absperrklappe für den Einsatz in einer Leitung einer raumlufttechnischen Anlage oder einer maschinellen Entrauchungsanlage | [2014/38] | English: | Shutoff valve for use in a conduit of an air conditioning system or a mechanical smoke ventilation assembly | [2014/38] | French: | Clapet de fermeture destiné à être utilisé dans une conduite d'une installation de ventilation ou d'une installation de désenfumage mécanique | [2014/38] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2013 | Examination requested [2014/38] | 18.03.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/43] | 08.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2015/43] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.2015 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]DE9103382U (KARL ZIMMERMANN) [X] 1,8,9,11,13,16-18,21 * the whole document * [I] 2-7,10,12,14,15,19,20; | [X]DE19849863 (STRULIK SA [FR]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 37 - column 4, line 15 * * figure - *; | [A]EP2450642 (RF TECHNOLOGIES NV [BE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]EP1960060 (FLAEKT WOODS AB [SE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |