EP2639414 - Cooling system for a fuel cell and connected steam turbine [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.03.2016 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.10.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): AL | published on 14.11.2018 [2018/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2013/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Badenhop, Thomas Breslauer Str. 12 51688 Wipperfürth / DE | [2013/38] | Representative(s) | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | [2015/19] |
Former [2013/38] | Hocker, Thomas Vaillant GmbH Berghauser Strasse 40 42859 Remscheid / DE | Application number, filing date | 13158684.4 | 12.03.2013 | [2013/38] | Priority number, date | DE20121005121 | 14.03.2012 Original published format: DE102012005121 | [2013/38] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2639414 | Date: | 18.09.2013 | Language: | DE | [2013/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2639414 | Date: | 16.04.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/16] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2639414 | Date: | 06.05.2015 | Language: | DE | [2015/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.03.2014 | Classification | IPC: | F01K23/02, H01M8/04, F22B1/18, F22G1/02 | [2014/16] | CPC: |
H01M8/04067 (EP);
F22B1/18 (EP);
F22G1/02 (EP);
H01M8/04014 (EP);
H01M8/04029 (EP);
H01M8/04111 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2013/38] | F01K23/02, H01M8/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2015/19] |
Former [2013/38] | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR | Title | German: | Kühlsystem für eine Brennstoffzelle und damit verbundene Dampfturbine | [2013/38] | English: | Cooling system for a fuel cell and connected steam turbine | [2013/38] | French: | Système de refroidissement pour pile à combustible avec une turbine à vapeur | [2013/38] | Examination procedure | 19.09.2014 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.09.2014 | Examination requested [2014/46] | 03.12.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2015 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 23.03.2015 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.2015 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.12.2014 | Opposition(s) | 09.02.2016 | No opposition filed within time limit [2016/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 12.03.2013 | AL | 06.05.2015 | CY | 06.05.2015 | CZ | 06.05.2015 | DK | 06.05.2015 | EE | 06.05.2015 | ES | 06.05.2015 | FI | 06.05.2015 | HR | 06.05.2015 | IT | 06.05.2015 | LT | 06.05.2015 | LV | 06.05.2015 | MC | 06.05.2015 | MK | 06.05.2015 | MT | 06.05.2015 | NL | 06.05.2015 | PL | 06.05.2015 | RO | 06.05.2015 | RS | 06.05.2015 | SE | 06.05.2015 | SI | 06.05.2015 | SK | 06.05.2015 | SM | 06.05.2015 | TR | 06.05.2015 | BG | 06.08.2015 | NO | 06.08.2015 | GR | 07.08.2015 | IS | 06.09.2015 | PT | 07.09.2015 | [2018/46] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 12.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
TR | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 12.03.2013 | |
CY | 06.05.2015 | ||
CZ | 06.05.2015 | ||
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MK | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
SM | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2017/40] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
MT | 06.05.2015 | ||
NL | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SE | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/49] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
MC | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/24] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SI | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/21] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
IT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/10] | CZ | 06.05.2015 | |
DK | 06.05.2015 | ||
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
PL | 06.05.2015 | ||
RO | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
SK | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/09] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
EE | 06.05.2015 | ||
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | DK | 06.05.2015 | |
ES | 06.05.2015 | ||
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/50] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
BG | 06.08.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
IS | 06.09.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | ||
Former [2015/49] | ES | 06.05.2015 | |
FI | 06.05.2015 | ||
HR | 06.05.2015 | ||
LT | 06.05.2015 | ||
LV | 06.05.2015 | ||
RS | 06.05.2015 | ||
NO | 06.08.2015 | ||
GR | 07.08.2015 | ||
PT | 07.09.2015 | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP1207580 (RENAULT [FR]) [X] 1-5 * paragraph [0006] - paragraph [0015]; figure 1; claims 1-15 * [Y] 6-11; | [XY]FR2301103 (UNITED TECHNOLOGIES CORP [US]) [X] 1-4 * figures 1, 2; claims 1-10 * [Y] 6-11; | [XP]WO2013025256 (GEN ELECTRIC [US], et al) [XP] 1 * paragraph [0003] - paragraph [0008] *; | [XY]JPH0260060 (TOKYO GAS CO LTD, et al) [X] 1-5 * abstract * [Y] 6-11; | [X]JPS6134863 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [YD]DE19608738 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [YD] 6-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | DE19608738 | DE102006047493 |